EP2624819 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING IMPROVED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Liverpool Foundation Building 765 Brownlow Hill Liverpool, L69 7ZX / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Iota NanoSolutions Limited 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANNARD, Steven, Paul IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool L69 7ZB / GB | 02 /
DUNCALF, David IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool L69 7ZB / GB | 03 /
FOSTER, Alison, Jayne IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool L69 7ZB / GB | 04 /
LONG, James IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool L69 7ZB / GB | 05 /
WANG, Dong IOTA NanoSolutions Ltd MerseyBio Crown Street Liverpool L69 7ZB / GB | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11778932.1 | 04.10.2011 | WO2011GB01441 | Priority number, date | GB20100016776 | 05.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201016776 | GB20100016765 | 05.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201016765 | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045994 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624819 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/5138 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (US);
A01N25/22 (US);
A01N25/30 (US);
A01N43/40 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/653 (US);
A01N43/90 (US);
A01N47/02 (US);
A01N47/38 (US);
A01N53/00 (US);
A23K20/10 (US);
A23L33/10 (US);
A61K9/5146 (EP,US);
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBESSERTEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/33] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING IMPROVED COMPOSITIONS | [2013/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS AMÉLIORÉES | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 03.06.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/10] | 01.08.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/22] | 03.06.2013 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/22] | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0040220 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [X] 21-25 * the whole document * * claims 1-10 *[I] 1-20; | [X] - KATOU H ET AL, "Kinetics of solvent extraction/evaporation process for PLGA microparticle fabrication", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 364, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2008.08.015, ISSN 0378-5173, (20081119), pages 45 - 53, (20080822), XP025562418 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * * abstract * * References cited * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2008.08.015 | [X] - TAMBER H ET AL, "Formulation aspects of biodegradable polymeric microspheres for antigen delivery", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2004.09.002, ISSN 0169-409X, (20050110), pages 357 - 376, (20050110), XP025283915 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2004.09.002 | [X] - FISCHER S ET AL, "One-step preparation of polyelectrolyte-coated PLGA microparticles and their functionalization with model ligands", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 111, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2005.11.015, ISSN 0168-3659, (20060310), pages 135 - 144, (20060310), XP024957439 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2005.11.015 | [X] - FREITAS S ET AL, "Microencapsulation by solvent extraction/evaporation: reviewing the state of the art of microsphere preparation process technology", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050202), vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2004.10.015, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 313 - 332, XP004710961 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.10.015 | by applicant | WO2006079409 | WO2008006712 | - D. HORN, J. RIEGER, "Aqueous Nanoparticles in the Aqueous Phase - Theory, Experiment and Use", AGNEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2001), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1002/1521-3773(20011203)40:23<4330::AID-ANIE4330>3.0.CO;2-W, pages 4330 - 4361, XP001111848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20011203)40:23<4330::AID-ANIE4330>3.0.CO;2-W |