EP2618979 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A NUMBER OF WALL COVERING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bolidt Maatschappij tot Exploitatie van Kunststoffen en Bouwwerken B.V. Nijverheidsweg 37 3341 LJ Hendrik-Ido-Ambacht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Bolidt Maatschappij tot Exploitatie van Kunststoffen en Bouwwerken B.V. Nijverheidsweg 37 3341 LJ Hendrik-Ido-Ambacht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOL, Rientz Willem Achterambachtseweg 30 NL-3342 LB Hendrik-ido-ambacht / NL | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Louwaard, Jan-Willem Paul, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Louwaard, Jan-Willem Paul, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11779238.2 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011NL50641 | Priority number, date | NL20102005379 | 21.09.2010 Original published format: NL 2005379 | [2013/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012039616 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618979 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/02, B29C39/10, B29L31/10, B29C69/00, B63B3/48, B63B3/68, B63B5/24, E04F13/08, E04F13/18, B29D99/00, B44C1/22, B44C5/04, B44F9/02 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B29C39/025 (EP,US);
E04F13/08 (US);
B29C39/10 (EP,US);
B29C69/001 (EP,US);
B44C5/04 (EP,US);
B44F11/00 (EP,US);
B63B3/56 (US);
B63B3/68 (EP,US);
B29C2793/00 (EP,US);
B29C33/12 (EP,US);
B29L2007/002 (EP,US);
B29L2031/10 (EP,US);
B29L2031/732 (EP,US);
B63B3/48 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANZAHL VON WANDVERKLEIDUNGSELEMENTEN | [2013/31] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A NUMBER OF WALL COVERING ELEMENTS | [2013/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN CERTAIN NOMBRE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE REVÊTEMENT MURAL | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3787544 (BARNETTE S) [X] 19,20,23-25 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1-16, 37-42 * * the whole document * [Y] 17 [I] 26,27; | [XI]US3961118 (MICHAELIS DAVID E) [X] 19,20 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 21,24-27; | [XAYI]EP0063922 (ARYAN GROUP LIMITED [BS]) [X] 19,20 * abstract * [A] 1,6,8 [Y] 2,5 [I] 21; | [A]NL8902394 (BOLIDT KUNSTSTOFTOEPASSING B V) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [XYI]JPH0557864 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3,7,9-11,14,15,19,20 * abstract * [Y] 2,4,5,12,13,16-18,21-23 [I] 6,8,24,26,27; | [Y]US5850720 (WILLIS MARK C [US]) [Y] 17,23 * abstract *; | [XYI]WO2004054774 (CANTI & FIGLI SRL [IT], et al) [X] 19,20 * abstract * * page 6 * [Y] 2,5,16 [I] 21; | [XAY]NL1026168C (BOLIDT MIJ TOT EXPLOITATIE VAN [NL]) [X] 19,20 * page 5, line 16 - line 19; figures 1, 2 * * the whole document * [A] 1,3,6 [Y] 4; | [Y]NL1028415C (BOLIDT MIJ TOT EXPLOITATIE VAN [NL]) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [XYI]WO2007060392 (DOUGLASS JAMES EDWARD [GB]) [X] 19-22 * abstract * [Y] 16-18,21,22 [I] 23-27 | Examination | US1706661 | US4581255 |