EP2640541 - METHOD OF AND SYSTEM FOR BRAZING ALUMINUM WORKPIECES USING A FLAME AND MONITORING OF THE FLAME COLOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 1 Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRECHECK, Timothy 816 Leta Street Chittenango New York 13037 / US | 02 /
JAWOROWSKI, Mark R. 64 Uplands Way Glastonbury Connecticut 06033 / US | 03 /
YORK, Lester J. 144 Boston Street Syracuse New York / US | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11779515.3 | 21.10.2011 | WO2011US57192 | Priority number, date | US20100415411P | 19.11.2010 Original published format: US 415411 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012067752 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640541 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K3/04, B23K3/08, B23K1/19 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B23K1/00 (EP,US);
B23K31/12 (US);
B23K1/0012 (EP,US);
B23K1/19 (EP,US);
B23K3/043 (EP,US);
B23K3/08 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM LÖTEN VON ALUMINIUMWERKSTÜCKEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER FLAMME UND ÜBERWACHUNG DER FLAMMENFARBE | [2013/39] | English: | METHOD OF AND SYSTEM FOR BRAZING ALUMINUM WORKPIECES USING A FLAME AND MONITORING OF THE FLAME COLOR | [2013/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR BRASER DES PIÈCES EN ALUMINIUM À L'AIDE D'UNE FLAMME ET SURVEILLER LA COULEUR DE LA FLAMME | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 13.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6216897 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [A]WO9518695 (KRUPP VDM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]EP1347241 (PALAZZETTI LELIO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]KR100817850B (KOREA POLYTECH UNIV IND ACAD [KR], et al) [Y] 6-20 * figure - *; | [A]JP2009148807 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]JP2010247180 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * |