EP2630335 - HYDRAULIC DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE PITCH OF A PROPELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRETTES, Frédéric Snecma Pi (aji) Rond Point René Ravaud - Réau F-Moissy-Craymayel 77550 / FR | 02 /
LAVIE, Alain, François, Jean Snecma Pi (aji) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 03 /
RAULIN, Dominique Snecma Pi (aji) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy Cramayel Cedex / FR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, Rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/35] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87, rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11779773.8 | 30.09.2011 | [2017/01] | WO2011FR52290 | Priority number, date | FR20100058594 | 21.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058594 | [2013/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052649 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630335 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2630335 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D7/00, F04D29/56 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
F01D7/00 (EP,US);
F04D29/323 (EP,US);
F04D29/563 (US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
F05D2260/50 (EP,US);
F05D2260/79 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÄNDERUNG DES ANSTELLWINKELS EINES PROPELLERS | [2013/35] | English: | HYDRAULIC DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE PITCH OF A PROPELLER | [2013/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE DE CHANGEMENT DE PAS D'HELICE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 03.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2011 | AL | 04.01.2017 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | IE | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | LU | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1059422 (SNECMA MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] ** figures 1,5,9 *; | [A]US6692177 (CRUDELE WALTER [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 27 * * figures 6-11 *; | [XI]FR2928979 (SNECMA SA [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 19-28 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, lines 11-15 * * figures 3,4 * [I] 2; | [A]FR2937678 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 5, lines 6-28 * * figures 1-3 * |