EP2569320 - (+)-3-HYDROXYMORPHINAN-BASED POLYCYCLE DERIVATIVES AS NEUROPROTECTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Cross Corporation 303 Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-770 / KR | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jinhwa 303 Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-770 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong Yup 303 Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-770 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jeongmin 303 Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-770 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Kwang Woo 303 Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-770 / KR | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11780837.8 | 13.05.2011 | WO2011KR03548 | Priority number, date | US20100334371P | 13.05.2010 Original published format: US 334371 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011142620 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2569320 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/08, C07D491/08, C07D471/08, A61K31/5386, A61P25/28, A61P25/16 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C07D498/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5386 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D491/08 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | C07D498/08, C07D491/08, A61K31/5386, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | POLYZYKLISCHE DERIVATE AUF (+)-3-HYDROXYMORPHINAN-BASIS ALS NEUROPROTEKTIVA | [2013/12] | English: | (+)-3-HYDROXYMORPHINAN-BASED POLYCYCLE DERIVATIVES AS NEUROPROTECTANTS | [2013/12] | French: | DÉRIVÉS POLYCYCLIQUES À BASE DE (+)-3-HYDROXYMORPHINANE EN TANT QUE NEUROPROTECTEURS | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO2011014003 (GREEN CROSS CORP [KR], et al) [AP] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular the examples * | [AD] - WEI ZHANG ET AL, "3-Hydroxymorphinan, a metabolite of dextromethorphan, protects nigrostriatal pathway against MPTP-elicited damage both in vivo and in vitro", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US, (20061201), vol. 20, no. 14, doi:10.1096/FJ.06-6006COM, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 2496 - 2511, XP008118601 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular page 2496 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.06-6006com | [A] - ZHANG A ET AL, "Synthesis of aminothiazole derived morphinans", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, (20030818), vol. 44, no. 34, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(03)01560-0, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 6459 - 6462, XP004442775 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * in particular page 6459 and scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(03)01560-0 | International search | [A]US2008234307 (SCHUETZ JOHANNES [AT], et al); | [A]US2009203723 (INAGAKI MASANAO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006063792 (DOLLE ROLAND E [US], et al) |