EP2569199 - PROGRAMMABLE ELECTRIC HAND TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Generation I.D.E.A., LLC. 1854 NDSU Research Circle North Fargo, North Dakota 58102 / US | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMB, Aaron 207 5th Avenue West West Fargo, North Dakota 58078 / US | 02 /
SNIDER, Douglas 1648 West Hollywood Avenue 3 Chicago, Illinois 60660 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11781003.6 | 25.04.2011 | WO2011US33808 | Priority number, date | US201113051779 | 18.03.2011 Original published format: US201113051779 | US20100332769P | 08.05.2010 Original published format: US 332769 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/12] | US20110051779 | 18.03.2011 | |
US20100332769P | 08.05.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011142959 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2569199 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/14, B62B1/12, B62B1/06, B62B5/00, G05B19/05 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B62B1/14 (EP,US);
B62B1/26 (EP,US);
B62B2203/13 (EP,US);
B62B2203/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARER ELEKTRISCHER HANDKARREN | [2013/12] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE ELECTRIC HAND TRUCK | [2013/12] | French: | CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION MANUEL ÉLECTRIQUE PROGRAMMABLE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20000008116U (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH11152038 (OKUDAYA GIKEN KK); | [Y]US2008224433 (SETZER MITCHELL OLIN [US], et al); | [A]US2007152413 (WHITE ANTHONY R [AU]); | [A]KR20090006385U (HAN IL E HWA CO., LTD.) |