EP2632519 - A NEBULIZER, A CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, AND A METHOD OF CONTROLLING A NEBULIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERSCHUEREN, Alwin, Rogier, Martijn c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/36] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11781653.8 | 25.10.2011 | [2020/31] | WO2011IB54758 | Priority number, date | EP20100189405 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: EP 10189405 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012056398 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632519 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2632519 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, B05B12/08, B05B17/06, // B05B17/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A61M11/005 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (US);
B05B12/08 (EP,US);
B05B17/0607 (US);
B05B17/0615 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | A61M15/00, B05B17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER, STEUERUNGSEINHEIT ZUR STEUERUNG DESSELBEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES VERNEBLERS | [2013/36] | English: | A NEBULIZER, A CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, AND A METHOD OF CONTROLLING A NEBULIZER | [2013/36] | French: | NÉBULISEUR, UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR LE COMMANDER, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN NÉBULISEUR | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2011 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | IE | 25.10.2020 | LU | 25.10.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GB | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1219314 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 22] , [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 32] , [0 33]; figure 2 *; | [I]US2004031488 (TERADA TAKAO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0094] - [0095] - [ 199] - [0202]; figures 2, 30, 31 *; | [A]US2007277816 (MORRISON MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 34]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2008173729 (WENG SHIH-YI [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0058] , [0066]; figures 2, 8 * | Examination | JPH07284706 | US2008156320 |