EP2640568 - GRIPPER FOR GRASPING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS IMMERSED IN A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEL, Roger Beethovenstrasse 4a 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
STRAUBE, Karsten Neumühlenweg 30 06886 Lutherstadt Wittenberg / DE | 03 /
LÄSSIG, Günter Am Osthang 32 63785 Obernburg / DE | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/39] | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11782629.7 | 17.11.2011 | [2016/33] | WO2011EP70308 | Priority number, date | US20100415422P | 19.11.2010 Original published format: US 415422 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066060 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640568 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2640568 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, B65B35/18 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B29D11/0024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GREIFER ZUM ERFASSEN EINER IN EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT GETAUCHTEN OPHTHALMISCHEN LINSE | [2013/39] | English: | GRIPPER FOR GRASPING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS IMMERSED IN A LIQUID | [2013/39] | French: | PINCE SERVANT À SAISIR UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE IMMERGÉE DANS UN LIQUIDE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 15.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | MT | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
MT | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
MT | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2007000801 (MAURAN CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0052] , [0079]; figure - *[A] 9-15; | [X]WO2009103732 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,13 * page 9, paragraph l - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 5 * |