EP2571989 - METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION OF DOWNREGULATED IN RENAL CELL CARCINOMA (DRR) IN MALIGNANT GLIOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION OF DOWNREGULATED I RENAL CELL CARCINOMA I MALIGNANT GLIOMAS | ||
[2016/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, Québec H3A 2T5 / CA | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRECCA, Kevin 23 Orée du Bois Est Verdun, Québec H3E 2A2 / CA | 02 /
DAMHA, Masad 3166 Pierre Thomas Hurteau St-Herbert, Québec J3Y 8N9 / CA | 03 /
DELEAVEY, Glen 3445 Hutchison Street 905 Montréal, Québec H2X 2G2 / CA | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 11782819.4 | 18.05.2011 | WO2011CA00591 | Priority number, date | US20100345751P | 18.05.2010 Original published format: US 345751 P | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143762 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2571989 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, A61P35/00, C12N15/85 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K48/005 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER EXPRESSION VON DOWNREGULATED IN RENAL CELL CARCINOMA (DRR) IN BÖSARTIGE GLIOME | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION OF DOWNREGULATED IN RENAL CELL CARCINOMA (DRR) IN MALIGNANT GLIOMAS | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE L'EXPRESSION DE DOWNREGULATED IN RENAL CELL CARCINOMA (DRR) DANS DES GLIOMES MALINS | [2016/48] |
Former [2013/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER EXPRESSION BÖSARTIGER GLIOME AUS HERUNTERREGULIERTEN NIERENZELLKARZINOMEN | ||
Former [2013/13] | METHOD FOR REDUCING EXPRESSION OF DOWNREGULATED I RENAL CELL CARCINOMA I MALIGNANT GLIOMAS | ||
Former [2013/13] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE L'EXPRESSION DE GÈNES RÉGULÉS À LA BAISSE DANS DES HYPERNÉPHROMES DANS DES GLIOMES MALINS | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 15.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CN101474413 [ ]; | [A]WO2005007830 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [A]CN101474413 (UNIV SICHUAN [CN]); | International search | [X]US2005244851 (BLUME JOHN E [US], et al); |