EP2573067 - AROMATIC BUTAN-2-OL COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION METHODS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Pharmacology and Toxicology Academy of Military Medical Sciences P.L.A. China No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100-850 / CN | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Institute Of Pharmacology And Toxicology Academy Of Militaty Medical Sciences P.L.A. No. 27 Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Song No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 02 /
ZHONG, Wu No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Ping No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Junhai No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 05 /
ZHENG, Zhibing No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 06 /
XIE, Yunde No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 07 /
ZHAO, Guoming No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian Beijing 100850 / CN | 08 /
WANG, Xiaokui No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Lili No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 10 /
LI, Xingzhou No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | 11 /
ZHOU, Xinbo No. 27, Taiping Road Haidian District Beijing 100850 / CN | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2018/41] |
Former [2013/13] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11782849.1 | 16.05.2011 | [2018/41] | WO2011CN00849 | Priority number, date | CN201010173785 | 17.05.2010 Original published format: CN201010173785 | [2013/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143932 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573067 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2573067 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C215/62, C07C217/72, A61K31/137, A61P31/06 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C07C217/72 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61P31/06 (EP);
C07C213/00 (US);
C07C215/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | C07C215/30, C07C213/08, A61K31/137, A61P31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE BUTAN-2-OL-VERBINDUNGEN SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2013/13] | English: | AROMATIC BUTAN-2-OL COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION METHODS AND USES THEREOF | [2013/13] | French: | COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES DE BUTAN-2-OL, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2012 | Translation filed | 23.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 30.09.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 26.11.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2011 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | MT | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | IE | 16.05.2019 | LU | 16.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004011436 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y] - BURGER A ED - JUCKER E, Isosterism and bioisosterism in drug design, PROGRESS IN DRUG RESEARCH. FORTSCHRITTE DER ARNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG. PROGRES DES RECHERCHES PHARMACEUTIQUES; [PROGRESS IN DRUG RESEARCH], BASEL, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG, CH, PAGE(S) 287 - 371, (19910101), XP002096229 [Y] 1-12 * see text of bottom p.306 and figures of top of p.307; page 306, paragraph last - page 307 * | International search | [A]CN1671667 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [A]CN1976704 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [XP] - LIU, PING ET AL., "(1R*,2R*)-1-(4-Chlorophenyl)-4-dimethylamino-1-(3- methoxy-2-naphthyl)-2-(1-naphthyl)butan-2-ol", ACTA CRYST., (20100605), vol. E66, page O1571, XP055108036 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S160053681001891X | [X] - LIU, PING ET AL., "(1R*,2R*)-I-(7-Bromo-3-methoxy-naphthalen-2-yl)- 4-(dimethylamino)-2-(naphthalen-1-yl)-1-phenylbutan-2-ol", ACTA CRYST., (20100213), vol. E66, page O636, XP055108039 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S1600536810005209 | [Y] - LUCAS SIMON ET AL., "Novel aldosterone synthase inhibitors with extended carbocyclic skeleton by a combined ligand-based and structure-based drug design approach", J. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 51, no. 19, pages 6138 - 6149, XP055100489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm800683c | [Y] - IRAN HUU-ANH ET AL., "O-Ethoxycarbonylmethoxy esters of homocalix[n]naphthalenes: synthesis and recognition behaviour towards alkali cations", J INCL PHENOM MACROCYCL CHEM., (2008), vol. 60, pages 43 - 49, XP019574937 |