EP2712126 - NETWORKING METHOD, SERVER END DEVICE, CLIENT END DEVICE AND NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2, Zone B Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Distric Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XU, Zhongjie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SHU, Long Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11782942.4 | 18.05.2011 | WO2011CN74244 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011144025 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2712126 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/28, H04W4/00, H04W4/20, H04W40/24 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H04L43/045 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2849 (EP,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H04L12/26, H04W4/00, H04W4/20, H04W12/06, H04W40/24 | ||
Former IPC [2014/13] | H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | VERNETZUNGSVERFAHREN, SERVER-ENDGERÄT, CLIENT-ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2014/13] | English: | NETWORKING METHOD, SERVER END DEVICE, CLIENT END DEVICE AND NETWORK SYSTEM | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT EN RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ SERVEUR, DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ CLIENT ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2013 | Translation filed | 25.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 27.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010082784 (ROSENBLATT MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-11* paragraphs [0118] - [0132] - [ 164] , [ 193] - [0206]; figures 9,17,29A-C * | International search | [X]CN1417973 (JIAXUN FEIHONG ELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]); | [A]JP2003143457 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]CN101047837 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP [JP]); | [A]CN101986763 (UNIV ZHEJIANG) |