EP2584736 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR PUSHING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Chenghui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yuhua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Bojie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Qiyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/17] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11783051.3 | 01.06.2011 | WO2011CN75102 | Priority number, date | CN201010224328 | 06.07.2010 Original published format: CN201010224328 | [2013/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011144134 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584736 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/12, H04L29/08 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L61/106 (EP,US);
H04L61/256 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L2101/654 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSGABE VON INFORMATIONEN | [2013/17] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR PUSHING INFORMATION | [2013/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE POUSSER D'INFORMATION | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | Translation filed | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 11.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2016 | 28.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/16] | 10.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03019973 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [I] 1-7,17-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 20 * * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 9 *; | [A]DE10361949 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-20* paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0013] , [0016] *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Support of Push service (Release 5)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.875, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020301), no. V5.1.0, pages 1 - 70, XP050364069 [X] 1-7,17-20 * paragraphs [03.1] , [46.2] , [7.2.1] , [7.2.1.1] , [7.2.1.3] , [7.2.2.1] , [7.2.2.2] * * paragraphs [7.5.2] , [7.5.3] , [7.5.5] , [7.5.6] , [7.5.11] * | International search | [A]US2002138622 (DORENBOSCH JHEROEN P [US], et al); | [X]CN1567846 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101277311 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |