EP2573438 - PILOT OPERATED SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGK CO., Ltd. 1211-4 Kunugidacho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROTA, Hisatoshi c/o TGK CO. LTD. 1211-4, Kunugida-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11783214.7 | 22.04.2011 | WO2011JP02392 | Priority number, date | JP20100114148 | 18.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010114148 | [2013/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011145275 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573438 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/40, F16K31/06 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
F16K31/06 (KR);
F16K31/404 (EP);
F16K31/408 (EP);
F16K31/42 (KR);
F16K31/423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | VORGESTEUERTES MAGNETVENTIL | [2013/13] | English: | PILOT OPERATED SOLENOID VALVE | [2013/13] | French: | ÉLECTROVANNE ACTIONNÉE PAR PILOTE | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | Translation filed | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5430529B (SHOKETSU KINZOKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA); | [A]JP2004132242 (TGK CO LTD); | [A]JP2002039429 (TGK CO LTD); | [A]JPH07198058 (NAKAGAWA DENKI KOGYO); | [A]JPH06174135 (TOTO LTD); | [A]JPH05248567 (KANE KOGYO KK); | [A]JPS60196481 (CKD CORP) | by applicant | JPH08338557 |