EP2573159 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POWDER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lion Corporation 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUEKUNI, Tomonari c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 02 /
KUBOZONO, Takayasu c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 03 /
HORIE, Kodo c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11783652.8 | 20.05.2011 | WO2011JP61644 | Priority number, date | JP20100117395 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010117395 | [2013/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011145720 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573159 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, A01N25/00, A01N25/12, A01N59/00, A01P3/00, C11D7/10, C11D7/32, C11D17/06, A01N59/16, A01N59/20, C11D3/39, D06L3/02 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/12 (US);
A01N59/20 (EP,US);
C11D11/0088 (EP,US);
C11D3/3932 (EP,US);
C11D7/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N25/12, A01N37/02, A01N37/44, A01N59/00, A01N59/02, A01N59/26, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/20, A01N25/12, A01N37/02, A01N37/44, A01N59/00, A01N59/02, A01N59/26, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/13] | C11D11/00, A01N25/00, A01N25/12, A01N59/00, A01P3/00, C11D7/10, C11D7/32, C11D17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PULVERMISCHUNGEN | [2013/13] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POWDER MIXTURE | [2013/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MÉLANGE DE POUDRES | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2012 | Translation filed | 08.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 25.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009078459 (LION CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2233558 (LION CORP [JP]) [P] * page 49; examples 24, 27-30, 32; table 13 * * page 48; examples 1-4; table 12 * * page 44; examples 11, 12, 15-18; table 9 * * paragraph [0040] ** page 42; examples 1, 2,; table 8 * | International search | [A]WO2009078459 (LION CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009149748 (LION CORP); | [A]JP2009155292 (LION CORP); | [A]JP2009155578 (LION CORP) | by applicant | JP2009149748 |