EP2573715 - Card with a detachable micro SD device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | MICROSD DEVICE LOADED WITH A SMART CARD | ||
[2019/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Telink Co., Ltd. SK Namsan Bldg. 24 Toegye-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2018/37] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states SK Holdings Co., Ltd. (Seorin Dong) Jongro 26, Jongro-Gu Seoul 03188 / KR | ||
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states SK C&C Co., Ltd. SKu-Tower 25-1, Jeongja-dong Budang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-844 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Zang-Hee 1001 207 Unam First Vill Apt. 1274 Maetan-3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-373 / KR | 02 /
YEO, Sang-Koo 104 306 Yangjimaeul Geumho Apt. 27 Sunae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-837 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Dong-Su 601 106 Samsung Apt. Daechi-1-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-968 / KR | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 11783711.2 | 11.05.2011 | WO2011KR03476 | Priority number, date | KR20100047056 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: KR 20100047056 | [2013/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011145829 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2573715 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/077, G06F12/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G06F12/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/0721 (EP,US);
G06K19/07732 (EP,US);
G06K19/07741 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | G06K19/07, G06K19/077 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | Karte mit entnehmbarer MicroSD-Karte | [2019/13] | English: | Card with a detachable micro SD device | [2019/13] | French: | Carte avec un dispositif micro SD détachable | [2019/13] |
Former [2013/13] | MIT EINER SMART-CARD GELADENE MIKRO-SD-VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2013/13] | MICROSD DEVICE LOADED WITH A SMART CARD | ||
Former [2013/13] | DISPOSITIF MICRO SD DANS LEQUEL EST CHARGÉE UNE CARTE À PUCE | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2012 | Translation filed | 16.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010041245 (CELL IDEA INT L LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-8* page 1, line 14 - page 15, line 19; figures 2A, 2D, 3E * | International search | [Y]KR200347002Y (LG UPLUS CORP.); | [Y]JP2005322109 (RENESAS TECH CORP); | [Y]KR100936252B (DREAMER I CO LTD [KR]) |