EP2748044 - METHOD FOR BRAKING A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEICKMANN, Bodo Hofstraße 19 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
MEIER, Thomas-Willibald Wittelsbacherstr. 8 91161 Hilpoltstein / DE | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Harald AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2014/27] | Engelhardt, Harald AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11784428.2 | 15.11.2011 | [2018/02] | WO2011EP05740 | Priority number, date | DE201110111594 | 25.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011111594 | [2014/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013026459 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748044 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2748044 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/18 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
B60L7/18 (EP,US);
B60L3/0061 (EP,CN,US);
B60L15/2009 (EP,CN,US);
B60L50/40 (EP,CN,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,CN,US);
B60L50/52 (EP,CN,US);
B60L7/006 (EP,US);
B60L7/10 (US);
B60L7/12 (EP,CN,US);
B60L7/14 (EP,CN,US);
B60L7/26 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/14 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,CN,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,CN,US);
B60T2220/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60T2270/604 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/105 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/18109 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,CN,US);
B60Y2300/89 (EP,CN,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BREMSEN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2014/27] | English: | METHOD FOR BRAKING A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FREINAGE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2011 | AL | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | MT | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.11.2011 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP1876082 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraph [0028] * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 8-10; | [X]DE4446485 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 14 * * figure . *; | [Y]EP2314486 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [Y] 4-6 * figure 3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE102008023305 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 4,5 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 2 * | Examination | DE4446219 | WO2004101308 | by applicant | DE10336743 |