EP2643177 - CURRENT LIMIT CONTROL ON A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULMER, Scott D. 101 Sheridan Road Liverpool New York 13090 / US | 02 /
HOTALING, Donald B. 4304 Gates Road Jamesville New York 13078 / US | 03 /
PERKOVICH, Mark J. 5003 Saddlebrook Drive Fayetteville New York 13066 / US | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2013/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11784895.2 | 07.11.2011 | [2015/35] | WO2011US59528 | Priority number, date | US20100417008P | 24.11.2010 Original published format: US 417008 P | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012071159 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643177 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643177 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B60H1/3225 (EP,US);
F25D29/00 (US);
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
F25B49/025 (EP,US);
F25D29/003 (EP,US);
F25B2700/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMBEGRENZUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM TRANSPORTKÜHLSYSTEM | [2013/40] | English: | CURRENT LIMIT CONTROL ON A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2013/40] | French: | COMMANDE DE LIMITE DE COURANT SUR UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION DE TRANSPORT | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 29.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2011 | AL | 26.08.2015 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | IE | 07.11.2015 | LU | 07.11.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.11.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.11.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.11.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4219071 (CAREGLIO GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US6223546 (CHOPKO ROBERT A [US], et al) [AD] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US6223546 |