EP2633286 - IMPROVED-EFFICIENCY FIBRE-COUPLED TERAHERTZ SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARTORIUS, Bernd Württembergallee 22 14052 Berlin / DE | 02 /
ROEHLE, Helmut Im Eichengrund 5 13629 Berlin / DE | 03 /
STANZE, Dennis Seelingstr. 12 14059 Berlin / DE | 04 /
DIETZ, Roman Raumerstr. 38 10437 Berlin / DE | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2020/07] |
Former [2013/36] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11785330.9 | 25.10.2011 | [2020/07] | WO2011EP05530 | Priority number, date | DE20101049658 | 25.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010049658 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055574 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633286 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633286 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/3581 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G01N21/3581 (EP,US);
G01J5/22 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | G01N21/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENZ-VERBESSERTES FASERGEKOPPELTES TERAHERTZSYSTEM | [2013/36] | English: | IMPROVED-EFFICIENCY FIBRE-COUPLED TERAHERTZ SYSTEM | [2013/36] | French: | SYSTÈME À TÉRAHERTZ À FIBRES COUPLÉES À EFFICACITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 19.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2011 | AL | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | AT | 25.10.2020 | IE | 25.10.2020 | LU | 25.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [IY]FR2870386 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * page 7, line 13 - line 22 * * page 8, line 5 - line 7 * * page 6, line 10 - line 12 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,8; | [A]DE102006010301 (BATOP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0024] *; | [IY] - PACEBUTAS V ET AL, "Terahertz time-domain-spectroscopy system based on femtosecond Yb:fiber laser and GaBiAs photoconducting components", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20100720), vol. 97, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.3458826, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 31111 - 31111, XP012138382 [I] 1-3,5,10 * page 1 - page 2 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3458826 | [A] - FRANCOEUR S ET AL, "Band gap of GaAs1-xBix", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20030602), vol. 82, no. 22, doi:10.1063/1.1581983, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3874 - 3876, XP012034254 [A] 1-10 * page 3875 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1581983 | [Y] - DYSON A ET AL, "Comparison of Type I and Type II Heterojunction Unitravelling Carrier Photodiodes for Terahertz Generation", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080301), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 277 - 283, XP011206852 [Y] 4,6 * tables II, III * * figure 3 * * page 280, column l * | [Y] - STANZE D ET AL, "Coherent CW terahertz systems employing photodiode emitters", INFRARED, MILLIMETER, AND TERAHERTZ WAVES, 2009. IRMMW-THZ 2009. 34TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090921), ISBN 978-1-4244-5416-7, pages 1 - 3, XP031562560 [Y] 6,8 * figure 1 * * page 1, column r - page 2 * | Examination | DE102006010297 | - MANGENEY J ET AL, "Ion-irradiated In0.53Ga0.47As photoconductive antennas for THz generation and detection at 1.55 mum wavelength", COMPTES RENDUS - PHYSIQUE, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CRHY.2007.07.008, ISSN 1631-0705, (20080301), pages 142 - 152, (20071031), XP022616298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.crhy.2007.07.008 | - PACEBUTAS V ET AL, "Characterization of low-temperature molecular-beam-epitaxy grown GaBiAs layers", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20070701), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0268-1242/22/7/026, ISSN 0268-1242, pages 819 - 823, XP020115050 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/22/7/026 | - DARMO J ET AL, "Intra- and extra-cavity THz generation from optically and electrically confined photoconducting layer's", TERAHERTZ ELECTRONICS PROCEEDINGS, 2002. IEEE TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONF ERENCE ON 9 - 10 SEP 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020909), ISBN 978-0-7803-7630-4, pages 67 - 69, XP010605634 | - MADOURI D ET AL, "Bismuth alloying in GaAs: a first-principles study", COMPUTATIONAL MATERIALS SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.COMMATSCI.2008.01.059, ISSN 0927-0256, (20081001), pages 818 - 822, (20080310), XP025472518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.commatsci.2008.01.059 | by applicant | DE102007044839 |