EP2629744 - PRODUCT FOR TREATING CELLULITE, SKIN AGEING AND FOR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gourlaouen, Brigitte 8 rue Julien Lacroix 75020 Paris / FR | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Chantraine, Sylvie Hélène, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 11785733.4 | 19.10.2011 | WO2011FR52446 | Priority number, date | FR20100058532 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058532 | [2013/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052685 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2629744 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/23, A61K8/34, A61K8/42, A61K8/44, A61K8/49, A61K8/60, A61K8/67, A61K8/97, A61Q19/06, A61Q19/08 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
A61K8/23 (EP,US);
A61K36/9066 (US);
A23K20/10 (EP,US);
A23K20/105 (EP,US);
A23K20/111 (EP,US);
A23K20/142 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/30 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K36/03 (US);
A61K36/07 (US);
A61K36/074 (US);
A61K36/23 (US);
A61K36/41 (US);
A61K36/47 (US);
A61K36/484 (US);
A61K36/60 (US);
A61K36/704 (US);
A61K36/708 (US);
A61K36/73 (US);
A61K36/77 (US);
A61K36/81 (US);
A61K36/82 (US);
A61K36/88 (US);
A61K36/888 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/645 (EP,US);
A61K8/675 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K8/9722 (EP,US);
A61K8/9728 (EP,US);
A61K8/9771 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/884 (EP,US);
A61K2800/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | PRODUKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CELLULITE, HAUTALTERUNG UND ZUR PRÄVENTION VON ENTZÜNDUNGSPROZESSEN | [2013/35] | English: | PRODUCT FOR TREATING CELLULITE, SKIN AGEING AND FOR PREVENTING INFLAMMATORY PROCESSES | [2013/35] | French: | PRODUIT DE TRAITEMENT DE LA CELLULITE, DU VIEILLISSEMENT CUTANÉ ET DE PREVENTION DES PROCESSUS INFLAMMATOIRES. | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2014 | 31.10.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0107885 (CRINOS INDUSTRIA FARMACO [IT]) [A] 1-20* page 6 - page 7 *; | [A]WO0243691 (IDI IRCCS [IT], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, lines 1-5; example 1; claims 7-9 *; | [A]US2003158237 (SARAGOVI URI [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] - [ 102] *; | [XA]US2006251608 (WACHSBERG RICHARD [CA], et al) [X] 21 * example 2 * [A] 1-20; | [A]US2007212429 (HEUER MARVIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0057] , [0 70] - [0071] *; | [A]WO2008011364 (LINES THOMAS CHRISTIAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 24 * * page 6, lines 21-24 *; | [ID]FR2906143 (SOUDANT ETIENNE PIERRE DOMINIQ [FR]) [ID] 1-21 * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 13; claim - *; | [XA]WO2009053802 (ZEHETHOFER KARL [AT]) [X] 21 * page 6; example - * * claim - * [A] 1-20; | [A]WO2009137510 (THETA BIOMEDICAL CONSULTING & [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0 21] - [0023]; examples 2, 4, 6, 7 *; | [A]FR2937545 (SOUDANT ETIENNE [FR]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, lines 1-18 * * page 4, lines 16-26; example - *; | [XA]WO2010098595 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [X] 21 * Text examples 5 and 7; paragraphs [0001] , [0 12] - [0025]; claim - * [A] 1-20 | by applicant | WO2004037221 | US2005136537 | WO2007104867 | FR2906143 | - MICHAUD DS; LIU S, "dietary glycemic load, Cancer Epidemiology", BIOMARKERS & PREVENTION, (2005), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 138 - 47 |