EP2578850 - VIBRATION-DAMPING CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2020/38] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Yosuke c/o intellectual Property Department of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-10123 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Takeshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
SHIOZAWA, Yuuki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
OHTA, Mitsunori c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 05 /
SASAKI, Hiroki c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 06 /
ITOH, Akihiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIZAWA, Masahiko c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD., IP Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/38] |
Former [2013/15] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11786439.7 | 20.04.2011 | [2020/38] | WO2011JP59706 | Priority number, date | JP20100121322 | 27.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010121322 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011148739 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578850 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2578850 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02D29/02, B60W30/20, B60W50/06, // B60W50/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W20/11 (US);
B60W30/02 (US);
B60W30/20 (EP,US);
B60W50/06 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2270/147 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2030/041 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0024 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0033 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0083 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | F02D29/02, B60W30/20, B60W50/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDE STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2013/15] | English: | VIBRATION-DAMPING CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE L'AMORTISSEMENT DES VIBRATIONS POUR VÉHICULE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2012 | Translation filed | 15.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2011 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | IT | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | IE | 20.04.2021 | LU | 20.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.04.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.04.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MK | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.04.2011 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4744589 (BUMA SHUUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 21 *; | [Y]US2004128040 (STILLER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4* paragraphs [0011] - [0015] *; | [YD]JP2009127456 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6280108 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH08295151 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [X]JP2009127456 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |