EP2577821 - ENHANCED PLANARITY IN GaN EDGE EMITTING LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAT, Rajaram 8 Woodland Way Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11787379.4 | 26.05.2011 | WO2011US38015 | Priority number, date | US20100789956 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: US 789956 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011150135 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577821 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/10, H01S5/343, B82Y20/00, H01S5/32 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H01S5/3201 (EP,US);
H01S5/10 (KR);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/343 (KR);
H01S5/34333 (EP,US);
H01S5/320275 (EP,US);
H01S5/3216 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | H01S5/10, H01S5/343 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE PLANARITÄT IN GAN-EDGE-EMITTIERENDEN LASERN | [2013/15] | English: | ENHANCED PLANARITY IN GaN EDGE EMITTING LASERS | [2013/15] | French: | PLANARITÉ AMÉLIORÉE DANS DES LASERS GaN À ÉMISSION LATÉRALE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 09.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2011127050 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [E] 1,3,13,15 * page 17, lines 16-19,25-26; figures 4b-4d *; | [Y]WO2010041657 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-12,14 * paragraphs [0104] , [0105] , [0120]; figure 16 *; | [Y]US2008251781 (HAN SANG HEON [KR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-12,14 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figure 3 *; | [XP]WO2011022730 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [XP] 1 * page 18, lines 11-25; figure 7 * | International search | [A]WO2010041657 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009239084 (ROHM CO LTD); | [A] - J. KIM, ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS TRENDS, (200912), vol. 24, pages 61 - 76, XP055116909 | [A] - T. KYONO ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS EXPRESS, (201001), vol. 3, pages 11003-1 - 11003-3, XP008167295 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/APEX.3.011003 | [A] - M. FUNATO ET AL., JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (200606), vol. 45, no. 26, pages L659 - 662, XP002636794 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.45.L659 |