EP2576540 - HETEROARYL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2019/36] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPBELL, John, Emmerson 581 Mount Auburn Street Cambridge MA 02138 / US | 02 /
HEWITT, Michael, Charles 186 Holland Street Unit 2 Somerville MA 02144 / US | 03 /
JONES, Philip 86 Sylvan Street Danvers MA 01923 / US | 04 /
XIE, Linghong 20 Meeting House Lane Southborough MA 01772 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2019/36] |
Former [2014/02] | Wallinger, Michael, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/52] | Savic, Bojan, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | Ritter, Thomas Kurt, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11787386.9 | 26.05.2011 | [2019/36] | WO2011US38057 | Priority number, date | US20100411410P | 08.11.2010 Original published format: US 411410 P | US20100348683P | 26.05.2010 Original published format: US 348683 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011150156 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2576540 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2576540 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, C07D471/04, C07D401/06, A61K31/498, A61K31/519, A61P25/00, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/06, C07D413/06, C07D417/06, C07D471/14, C07D487/04, C07D491/056, C07D498/04, C07D498/14, C07D519/00, C07D409/14, C07D498/06 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
C07D498/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/5383 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/58 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/056 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
C07D498/14 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | C07D403/06, C07D471/04, C07D401/06, A61K31/498, A61K31/519, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEZEROARYLVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2013/15] | English: | HETEROARYL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2013/15] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROARYLÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17205058.5 / EP3318561 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2011 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 26.05.2020 | LU | 26.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.05.2011 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4036840 (O'BRIEN DARRELL E, et al) [X] 1-3,5,15,16 * compounds 3, 4, 12-20, 24-41, 43-51 *; | [X]JPH0264553 (CANON KK) [X] 1,5,14 * first compound in page 483 *; | [X]US5217980 (JANSSENS FRANS E [BE], et al) [X] 1,5 * intermediate 3, 12 , 17 *; | [X]WO2004076451 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * claim 1 and examples *; | [X]WO2005030769 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * CLAIM 1 AND EXAMPLES *; | [X]WO2005061496 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * 1, 2, 5-7, 10 *; | [X]WO2006072828 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,15,16 * claim 1 and examples and page 14 *; | [X]WO2007077490 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claim 1 and examples and page 14 *; | [X]WO2007100880 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,15,16 * example 32, claim 19 *; | [X]WO2007129183 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,15,16 * claim 1 and 17 *; | [X]WO2008020302 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claim 1 and e.g. examples 1, 17 etc., claim 16 *; | [X]WO2008046757 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,5 * claim 1 and examples *; | [X]WO2009094442 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * claim 1 and many examples e.g. 436, 465, 628, 699, 772 etc. *; | [X]WO2009143156 (SEPRACOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12 * claim 1 and 50 and examples *; | [I]WO2009152825 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [I] 1-16* claims 1 and 29 *; | [XP]WO2010132999 (CHLORION PHARMA INC [CA], et al) [XP] 1,5-10 * claims 1 and 44 *; | [XP]WO2011053559 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [XP] 1,5,15,16 * claim 1 and page 2, lines 23-28 *; | [X] - REITER J ET AL, "On triazoles. XXXV. The reaction of 5-amino-1,2,4-triazoles with di- and triketones", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, (19950301), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1002/JHET.5570320206, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 407 - 417, XP002322758 [X] 1-3,5 * compounds 8/4 and 8/5 in page 408 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570320206 | [X] - KOLASA T ET AL, "Heteroarylmethoxyphenylalkoxyiminoalkylcarboxylic acids as leukotriene biosynthesis inhibitors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20000101), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1021/JM9904102, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 690 - 705, XP002355625 [X] 1,5 * compounds and starting materials for compounds 10-11, 63-84, 87-93 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9904102 | International search | [X]US2010028299 (EINAV SHIRIT [US], et al); | [A]WO2010054067 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2010054078 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) | Examination | FR2133979 | EP0447285 | WO9418200 | EP0634169 | WO9740050 | WO2004035522 | WO2004058760 | WO2004058759 | WO2004071447 | US2004242615 | WO2006116355 | WO2007124546 | WO2007137819 | WO2008038018 | WO2011072694 | - P. L. Trakhtenberg ET AL, "Electronic structure and reactivity of 2-[2-(4-R-2-quinolyl)vinyl]thiophenes and 5-[2-(4-R-2-quinolyl)vinyl]-2,2?-bithiophenes", Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, (19790901), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:10.1007/BF00473838, ISSN 0009-3122, pages 970 - 975, XP055205154 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00473838 | - Robert D. Schuetz ET AL, "An Investigation of Some Approaches to the Synthesis of [alpha]-Cyclodipolymethylenedithiophenes", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (19620801), vol. 27, no. 8, doi:10.1021/jo01055a029, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2841 - 2846, XP055205158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01055a029 | - ROBERTSON D W ET AL, "Structure-activity relationships of (arylalkyl)imidazole anticonvulsants: comparison of the (fluorenylalkyl)imidazoles with nafimidone and denzimol", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19860101), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1021/JM00159A004, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1577 - 1586, XP008087539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00159a004 | - LIPSHUTZ B H ET AL, "METALATION STUDIES OF TRISUBSTITUTED OXAZOLES", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19800101), vol. 46, doi:10.1021/JO00320A036, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1410 - 1413, XP002301170 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00320a036 | - WALKER K A M ET AL, "1-(NAPHTHYLALKYL)-1H-IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, A NEW CLASS OF ANTICONVULSANT AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19810101), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1021/JM00133A015, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 67 - 74, XP002912929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00133a015 | - ZHANG X ET AL, "Heteroaryl-O-glucosides as novel sodium glucose co-transporter 2 inhibitors. Part 1", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 15, no. 23, ISSN 0960-894X, (20051201), pages 5202 - 5206, (20051201), XP027801221 | - Kathrin Kutlescha ET AL, "An intermolecular C-C coupling reaction of iridium complexes", New Journal of Chemistry, GB, (20100101), vol. 34, no. 9, doi:10.1039/c0nj00158a, ISSN 1144-0546, page 1954, XP055441449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0nj00158a | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5134127 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5674533 | US5733566 | WO2007129183 | WO2009152825 | WO2010034500 | WO2010126163 | WO2011072694 | - SODERLING et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19990000), vol. 96, pages 7071 - 76 | - LOUGHNEY et al., Gene, (19990000), vol. 234, pages 109 - 17 | - FUJISHIGE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 18438 - 45 | - Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, (19910000), pages 93 - 98 | - WILLIAMS et al., J. of Med. Chem., (19990000), vol. 42, pages 1481 - 1485 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - HARPER, Progress in Drug Research, (19620000), vol. 4, pages 221 - 294 | - WANG et al., Curr. Pharm. Design, (19990000), vol. 5, pages 265 - 287 | - PAULETTI et al., Adv. Drug. Delivery Rev., (19970000), vol. 27, pages 235 - 256 | - MIZEN et al., Pharm. Biotech., (19980000), vol. 11, pages 345 - 365 | - GAIGNAULT et al., Pract. Med. Chem., (19960000), pages 671 - 696 | - ASGHARNEJAD et al., Transport Processes in Pharmaceutical Systems, Marcell Dekker, (20000000), pages 185 - 218 | - BALANT et al., Eur. J. Drug Metab. Pharmacokinet., (19900000), vol. 15, pages 143 - 53 | - BALIMANE; SINKO, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 183 - 209 | - BROWNE, Clin. Neuropharmacol., (19970000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 12 | - BUNDGAARD, Arch. Pharm. Chem., (19790000), vol. 86, pages 1 - 39 | - BUNDGAARD, Controlled Drug Delivery, (19870000), vol. 17, pages 179 - 96 | - BUNDGAARD, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19920000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - FLEISHER et al., Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19960000), vol. 19, pages 115 - 130 | - FLEISHER et al., Methods Enzymol., (19850000), vol. 112, pages 360 - 381 | - FARQUHAR et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19830000), vol. 72, pages 324 - 325 | - FREEMAN et al., J. Chem. Soc., Chem. Commun., (19910000), pages 875 - 877 | - FRIIS; BUNDGAARD, Eur. J. Pharm. Sci., (19960000), vol. 4, pages 49 - 59 | - GANGWAR et al., Des. Biopharm. Prop. Prodrugs Analogs, (19770000), pages 409 - 421 | - NATHWANI; WOOD, Drugs, (19930000), vol. 45, pages 866 - 94 | - SINHABABU; THAKKER, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19960000), vol. 19, pages 241 - 273 | - STELLA et al., Drugs, (19850000), vol. 29, pages 455 - 73 | - TAN et al., Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 117 - 151 | - TAYLOR, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19960000), vol. 19, pages 131 - 148 | - VALENTINO; BORCHARDT, Drug Discovery Today, (19970000), vol. 2, pages 148 - 155 | - WIEBE; KNAUS, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 63 - 80 | - WALLER et al., Br. J. Clin. Pharmac., (19890000), vol. 28, pages 497 - 507 | - GRAUER et al., "Phosphodiesterase 10A Inhibitor Activity in Preclinical Models of the Positive, Cognitive, and Negative Symptoms of Schizophrenia", Journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, (20090000), vol. 331, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.109.155994, pages 574 - 90, XP008118361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.109.155994 | - THRELFELL et al., "Inhibition of Phosphodiesterase 10A Increases the Responsiveness of Striatal Projection Neurons to Cortical Stimulation", Journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, (20090000), vol. 328, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.108.146332, pages 785 - 95, XP008118360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.108.146332 | - SCHMIDT et al., "Preclinical Characterization of Selective Phosphodiesterase 10A Inhibitors: A New Therapeutic Approach to the Treatment of Schizophrenia", Journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, (20080000), vol. 325, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1124/J.PET.107.132910, pages 681 - 90, XP002534689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/J.PET.107.132910 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, Marcel Dekker, (19950000), pages 379 - 80 | - STILL et al., J. Org. Chem., (19780000), vol. 43, page 2923 | - KITIGAWA et al., J. Med. Chem., (20070000), vol. 50, page 4710 | - Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20050000), vol. 15, pages 2679 - 84 | - J. Med. Chem., (20040000), vol. 47, pages 4494 - 4506 | - J. Org. Chem., (19900000), vol. 55, pages 2838 - 2842 | - Aust. J. Chem., (19930000), vol. 46, pages 987 - 93 | - Recueil des Travaux Chimiques des Pays-Bas, (19630000), vol. 82, pages 988 - 995 | - Chem. Ber., (19670000), vol. 100, pages 555 - 559 | - J. Mol. Structure, (19970000), vol. 415, pages 53 - 63 | - J. Org. Chem., (20020000), vol. 67, pages 1102 - 1108 | - Chem. Commun., (20090000), pages 2145 - 2147 | US20100348683 | US20100411410 |