EP2577843 - BATTERY CHARGING APPARATUS AND BATTERY CHARGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2017/03] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAKURA, Hayato c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2013/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11789475.8 | 02.06.2011 | [2017/03] | WO2011JP03128 | Priority number, date | JP20110093939 | 20.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011093939 | JP20100127479 | 03.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010127479 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011152062 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577843 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577843 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/10, H02J7/00, // H01M10/052 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/441 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/443 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/70 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | H02J7/02, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEAUFLADEVORRICHTUNG UND BATTERIEAUFLADEVERFAHREN | [2013/15] | English: | BATTERY CHARGING APPARATUS AND BATTERY CHARGING METHOD | [2013/15] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 17.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2011 | AL | 18.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 02.06.2017 | LU | 02.06.2017 | MT | 02.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.06.2011 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008154956 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10-12 * abstract * * page 11, line 25 - page 14, line 2; figure 1; claims 1, 7,8 *; | [A]US2009104510 (FULOP RICARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,11,12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] , [0044] , [0089] , [0118] , [0130]; figures 1-3,6,11,12; claim 51 * | International search | [Y]JP2001186686 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2006246645 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]WO2008102528 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2010040499 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2003079059 | WO2008154956 |