EP2446806 - ENDOSCOPE SHAPE DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING SHAPE OF INSERTED PART OF ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAKAWA, Katsumi OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2012/18] | 01 /
HIRAKAWA, Katsumi c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO., LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11789550.8 | 19.04.2011 | WO2011JP59637 | Priority number, date | JP20100125154 | 31.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010125154 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011152141 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446806 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61B1/00147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER ENDOSKOPFORM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FORM DES EINGESETZTEN TEILS EINES ENDOSKOPS | [2012/18] | English: | ENDOSCOPE SHAPE DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING SHAPE OF INSERTED PART OF ENDOSCOPE | [2012/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FORME D'ENDOSCOPE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER LA FORME DE LA PARTIE INSÉRÉE D'UN ENDOSCOPE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | Translation filed | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 21.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6612992 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 41 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1632168 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0075] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraphs [0089] , [0093] ** figures 1,4a,9a-9c,10a-10c *; | [XA]US2007106114 (SUGIMOTO HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0040] , [0043] , [0044] , [0057] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 2,4-9 * [A] 3,5-8,11,13-16; | [X]JP2009090023 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-16 * | International search | [A]JPH1119027 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2007130154 (PENTAX CORP); | [A]JP2010104426 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) |