EP2579370 - CURRENT COLLECTOR FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY, ELECTRODE FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY, AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTA, Nobuhiro c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
HOSOE, Akihisa c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 03 /
MAJIMA, Masatoshi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 04 /
NITTA, Koji c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Setna, Rohan P. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11789650.6 | 23.05.2011 | WO2011JP61780 | Priority number, date | JP20100123830 | 31.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010123830 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011152241 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2579370 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M4/06, H01M4/13, H01M4/80, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0561 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/66 (KR);
H01M10/0561 (EP,US);
H01M10/0562 (KR);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/662 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | H01M4/66, H01M4/06, H01M4/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | STROMSAMMLER FÜR EINE BATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYT, ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE BATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYT UND BATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYT | [2013/15] | English: | CURRENT COLLECTOR FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY, ELECTRODE FOR NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY, AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY | [2013/15] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT DESTINÉ À UN ACCUMULATEUR À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, ÉLECTRODE DESTINÉE À UN ACCUMULATEUR À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX ET ACCUMULATEUR À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | Translation filed | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0717120 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, lines 22-26 * * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 19 * * page 4, lines 39-41 * * page 5, lines 14-17 * * examples 1, 2 * * figure 3 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US6280878 (MARUYAMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, lines 50-62 * * column 3, lines 8-10, 32-67 * | International search | [X]JP2001155739 (NISSHA PRINTING); | [X]JP2011096444 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JPH08170126 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2009093968 (SEIKO EPSON CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2009064645 (SEIKO EPSON CORP, et al); | [A]JP2002371327 (SHINKO WIRE CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2002371327 | JPH08170126 | - HANDBOOK OF BATTERIES, ASAKURA PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (19961220), page 219,231, |