EP2575722 - BEDRAIL CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAREFUSION 2200, INC 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOYLE, Mark 1227 Cuchara Drive Del Mar California 92014 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11790236.1 | 26.05.2011 | WO2011US38268 | Priority number, date | US20100792577 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: US 792577 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011153081 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575722 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, F16B2/18, A61G13/10 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
A47C21/00 (KR);
A61G7/05 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q3/02 (KR);
F16B2/06 (KR);
F16B2/185 (EP,US);
A61G13/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61G7/05, A47C21/00, F16B2/06, B23Q3/02, B25B5/06, B23P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | BETTSCHIENENKLEMME | [2013/15] | English: | BEDRAIL CLAMP | [2013/15] | French: | PINCE POUR CÔTÉ DE LIT | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010030981 (CAREFUSION CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * [I] 15; | [XI]US6622980 (BOUCHER MICHAEL M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document * [I] 4,5,9-14; | [XI]US2010108841 (KRONNER RICHARD F [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * figure - * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 4,5,9-14 | International search | [X]WO2010030981 (CAREFUSION CORP [US], et al); | [X]US7566038 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al); | [X]US6622980 (BOUCHER MICHAEL M [US], et al); | [A]US4487523 (MONROE LAWRENCE S [US]) |