EP2577386 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING AND USING EYEGLASSES WITH ADAPTIVE LENS DRIVEN BY GAZE DISTANCE AND LOW POWER GAZE TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiang, Wenyu 30 Richard Drive Short Hills, New Jersey 07078 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11790260.1 | 29.05.2011 | WO2011US38473 | Priority number, date | US20100349830P | 29.05.2010 Original published format: US 349830 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011153112 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577386 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02C7/08, G02C11/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
G02C7/083 (EP,US);
A61B3/0025 (US);
A61B3/113 (US);
G02C11/10 (EP,US);
G02C7/085 (US);
H04N25/533 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON BRILLEN MIT DURCH BLICKDISTANZ ANGEPASSTEN LINSEN UND NIEDRIGLEISTUNGS-BLICKVERFOLGUNG | [2013/15] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING AND USING EYEGLASSES WITH ADAPTIVE LENS DRIVEN BY GAZE DISTANCE AND LOW POWER GAZE TRACKING | [2013/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR RÉALISER ET UTILISER DES LUNETTES À LENTILLE ADAPTATIVE PILOTÉE PAR LA DISTANCE DU REGARD ET UN DISPOSITIF D'OCULOMÉTRIE DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 03.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4300818 (SCHACHAR RONALD A) [I] 1-3,7,14,15 * column 3, line 26 - column 7, line 13; figures 1-8 *; | [I]US5359444 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7,14,15* column 2, line 47 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-13 *; | [I]US2003231293 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7,14,15 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0135]; figures 1, 2, 5, 14 * * paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0201] *; | [XI]US2007028931 (HILLIS W D [US], et al) [X] 1,7,14,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0013] * [I] 2,3 | International search | [Y]WO9743006 (PAR TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [Y]US7517083 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al); | [A]US2010114540 (SHINOHARA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2010116999 (TUEMER TUEMAY [US], et al); | [Y] - HANSEN ET AL., "In the Eye of the Beholder: A Survey of Models for Eyes and Gaze.", (20090123), pages 1 - 42, URL: http://people.ict.usc.edu/-gratch/CSC1534lWitznerJiEyeTrackSurvey%282009%29.pdf, (20111226), XP008168764 |