EP2598164 - PERIPHERAL BLOOD SPARC ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abraxis BioScience, LLC 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Abraxis BioScience, LLC 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2100 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIEU, Vuong 4003 Jim Bowie Boulevard Agoura Hills, California 91301 / US | 02 /
LIU, Xiping 6035 Camellia Ave. Temple City, California 91780 / US | 03 /
DESAI, Beil 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2000 Los Angeles, California 90025 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11790462.3 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011US39060 | Priority number, date | US20100351246P | 03.06.2010 Original published format: US 351246 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011153431 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2598164 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K39/00 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | 03.01.2013 | ME | 03.01.2013 | Title | German: | PERIPHERBLUT-SPARC-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2013/23] | English: | PERIPHERAL BLOOD SPARC ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2013/23] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-SPARC DU SANG PÉRIPHÉRIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 08.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005117952 (AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-25 * paragraphs [0064] , [0066] * * example 8 * * claims 7,18-29,40-49,56-58 *; | [EL]WO2011137114 (ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE LLC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,11,12,15,19 * examples 1-5 * * figures 17,20 *[L] | International search | [A]US2005276811 (CARROLL MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [A]US2009175789 (BEHRENS CHRISTIAN [FR], et al); | [A]US2009291139 (TRIEU VUONG [US], et al) |