EP2770245 - LIGHT-SPREADING LED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Baishi Electric Co., Ltd. Simen Town Yuyao, Zhejiang 315470 / CN | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Marcus NINGBO BAISHI ELECTRIC CO. LTD Simen Town Yuyao Zhejiang 315470 / CN | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Winterstrasse 2 22765 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Prinz & Partner Esplanade 31 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11790847.5 | 25.10.2011 | WO2011CN81298 | Priority number, date | CN201110326189 | 24.10.2011 Original published format: CN201110326189 | [2014/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013059994 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770245 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21V8/00, F21Y101/02, F21K99/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
F21V7/0033 (EP,US);
F21K9/61 (EP,US);
F21K9/64 (EP,US);
F21V7/0016 (EP);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
F21S6/002 (EP);
F21S8/04 (EP);
F21V7/0091 (EP);
F21Y2105/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | F21S2/00, F21V7/00, F21V8/00, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | LICHTSTREUENDE LED-LAMPE | [2014/35] | English: | LIGHT-SPREADING LED LAMP | [2014/35] | French: | LAMPE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES À DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2011 | Translation filed | 13.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010079391 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2006245194 (KIKUCHI SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2010136920 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102042500 (CHUANGJUGUANG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN201892080U (JIAHONG PAN) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN201739822U (JIANGUO HONG) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN201126155Y (GUANGHAN OPTOELECTRONIC CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2009128921 (ROTH ERIC A [US]); | [A]CN101809365 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC); | [A]CN101806427 (AMA PRECISION INC); | [A]CN102121627 (INTEMATIX CORP US) |