EP2668074 - METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CORRECTING VEHICLE REFERENCE SPEED, AND VEHICLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2018/41] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNILS, Arne Böttgerstraße 19 60389 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
KASTEN, Manuel Eschenbachstr. 4 65795 Hattersheim / DE | 03 /
REIM, Nikolaus Rosenweg 7 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Schlosser, Martin Patentanwalt Hofleitenstraße 34 86356 Neusäß / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Brand, Markus Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2013/49] | Brand, Markus Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 11791576.9 | 07.12.2011 | [2016/39] | WO2011EP72109 | Priority number, date | DE20111003298 | 28.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011003298 | [2013/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012100871 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668074 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2668074 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/172, B60T8/1769 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
F02D43/04 (US);
B60T8/1769 (EP,US);
B60T2201/09 (EP,US);
B60T2250/04 (EP,US);
B60T2270/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND KORREKTUR DER FAHRZEUGREFERENZGESCHWINDIGKEIT UND FAHRZEUGSYSTEM | [2013/49] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CORRECTING VEHICLE REFERENCE SPEED, AND VEHICLE SYSTEM | [2013/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER ET CORRIGER LA VITESSE DE RÉFÉRENCE D'UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 06.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Wiedemann, Markus Ziegeleistraße 16 86399 Bobingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Wiedemann, Markus Patentanwalt Ludwigstrasse 1 86150 Augsburg / DE | 04.08.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/16] | 06.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.11.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | IE | 07.12.2016 | LU | 07.12.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | GB | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0331131 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,18* page 14, line 51 - page 15, line 47 *; | [YA]US5579230 (LIN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7-13,16-18 * figure 2 * [A] 3-6,14,15; | [A]WO0232732 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 4 * * abstract *; | [Y]DE102004040757 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7-13,16-18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]US2008071452 (TAN HUALIN [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0036] * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE19939979 | Opposition | DE3342553 | DE3545546 | DE3612170 | JPH0228045 | US5579230 | DE19910099 | DE19502420 | DE10044821 | DE10122653 | DE10225121 | DE19502384 | DE102004040757 | WO2005101031 | DE102009002360 |