EP2580576 - APPARATUS FOR SINGLE-MOLECULE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195, Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIOU, Chung-Fan No. 69 Sanmin Rd. Cyonglin Township Hsinchu County 307 / TW | 02 /
TSAI, Rung-Ywan 6F.-2, No.197 Dunhua N. Rd. Songshan District Taipei City 105 / TW | 03 /
LI, Yu-Tang 9F., No.15, Lane 68 Sec.1, Syuefu Rd. Tucheng City Taipei County 236 / TW | 04 /
SHIH, Chih-Tsung 7F, No.2, Nanzhong St. North Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 05 /
LI, Ming-Chia No.149 Zhongxiao St. Dajia Township Taichung County 437 / TW | 06 /
CHU, Chang-Sheng 1F., No.16, Alley 50 Lane 367, Sec. 1 Guangfu Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 07 /
CHUNG, Shuang-Chao No.25 Lanjhou St. Jhongli City Taoyuan County 320 / TW | 08 /
CHEN, Jung-Po No.7, Ln. 233 Bade 2nd Rd. Toufen Township Miaoli County 351 / TW | 09 /
PU, Ying-Chih No.17, Aly. 29, Ln. 43 Yunong Rd. East Dist. Tainan City 701 / TW | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11791952.2 | 10.06.2011 | [2017/14] | WO2011CN75598 | Priority number, date | US20100805411 | 29.07.2010 Original published format: US 805411 | US20100801503 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: US 801503 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011153962 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580576 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580576 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/63, B82B1/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/543, B82Y15/00, G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G01N21/648 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6486 (KR,US);
B82B1/00 (KR);
B82B1/001 (KR);
B82Y15/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/68 (KR);
G01N21/645 (US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/6482 (KR,US);
G01N2021/6484 (KR,US);
G01N2201/08 (KR);
G01N2201/088 (KR,US);
Y10S977/954 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S977/957 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | G01N21/63, B82B1/00, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINZELMOLEKÜLERKENNUNG | [2013/16] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SINGLE-MOLECULE DETECTION | [2013/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE MOLÉCULE UNIQUE | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 15.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
24.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pacific Biosciences Of California, Inc. 1305 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
24.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pacific Biosciences Of California, Inc. 1305 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2018/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
Pacific Biosciences Of California, Inc. 1305 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Kiddle, Simon John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | 31.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | Appeal following opposition | 17.07.2019 | Appeal received No. T1748/19 | 30.09.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 13.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1748/19 | 27.09.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2011 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | IE | 10.06.2017 | LU | 10.06.2017 | MT | 10.06.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0184197 (EDGELIGHT BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-36* page 5, line 7; page 15, paragraphs 2 & 3; page 22, line 17; page 26, line 1; claim 30 * | International search | [A]US6255083 (WILLIAMS JOHN G K [US]); | [X]US2002110839 (BACH DAVID [US], et al); | [A]WO03064997 (LARGE SCALE PROTEOMICS CORP [US], et al); | [Y]CN1708680 (GENEWAVE [FR]); | [A]CN101726462 (TOSHIBA KK) | by applicant | US6255083 | WO0184197 | US2002110839 | WO03064997 | US6946249 | CN1708680 | US7170050 | US2007141598 | US2008081769 | US7361466 | US7486865 | CN101726462 | - MCGUIRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 317, page 1687 | - MOERNER; FROMM, "REVIEW ARTICLE: Methods of single-molecule fluorescence spectroscopy and microscopy", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (2003), vol. 74, no. 8, pages 3597 - 3619 | - WALTER ET AL., "Do-it-yourself guide: how to use the modern single-molecule toolkit", NATURE METHODS, (2008), vol. 5, pages 475 - 489 | - TESSIER ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1986), vol. 158, pages 171 - 78 | - SHENDURE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1728 - 1732 | - HARRIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 320, pages 106 - 109 | - LEVIN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 34, no. 20, page 142 | - SHENDURE ET AL., NAT. REV. GENET., (2004), vol. 5, pages 335 - 44 | Opposition | US6255083 | WO0184197 | US2002110839 | WO03064997 | CN1708680 | CN101726462 |