EP2580726 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM OF INTELLIGENT NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Chunxiang c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Wilson, Alan Stuart, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southhampton, Hampshire SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11792797.0 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011US22131 | Priority number, date | CN20101199106 | 12.06.2010 Original published format: CN201010199106 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011156014 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580726 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q30/02, G06F17/30 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US);
G06F16/1734 (EP,US);
G06F16/2455 (EP,US);
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/3325 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR INTELLIGENTE NAVIGATION | [2013/16] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM OF INTELLIGENT NAVIGATION | [2013/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION INTELLIGENTE | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 29.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/39] | 16.08.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2018 | 03.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2007192318 (RAMER JOREY [US], et al); | [Y]US2010094845 (MOON JIN YOUNG [KR], et al) |