EP2580390 - METHOD FOR CONTAMINANT REMOVAL IN PAPER PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. 100 Mansell Court East Suite 300 Roswell GA 30076 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOICESHYN, Daniel, Mark 102 Gibson Street Grimsby ON L3M 1G9 / CA | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Rushton, David John Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Rushton, David John Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Rushton, David John Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11793090.9 | 08.06.2011 | [2019/11] | WO2011US39631 | Priority number, date | US20100353943P | 11.06.2010 Original published format: US 353943 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011156487 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580390 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580390 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D21C7/00, D21H17/68, D21H21/02 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
D21H17/67 (EP,US);
D21H17/68 (EP,US);
D21H21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | D21C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN IN DER PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2013/16] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTAMINANT REMOVAL IN PAPER PRODUCTION | [2013/16] | French: | MÉTHODE D'ÉVACUATION DE CONTAMINANT DANS LA PRODUCTION DU PAPIER | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 30.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2011 | AL | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | IE | 08.06.2019 | LU | 08.06.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 08.06.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HR | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 13.03.2019 | |
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 13.03.2019 | |
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 13.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0760406 (NALCO CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US5798023 (PRUSZYNSKI PRZEMYSLAW [CA], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2005098287 (MAH THOMAS C [CA]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *[Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2006029404 (ENZYMATIC DEINKING TECHNOLOGIE [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,7 * [Y] 1-15; | [XI]WO2006113896 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 5 * [I] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US4243480 (HERNANDEZ HENRY R, et al); | [Y]SU907117 (VN PROIZV OB CELLJULOSZNO [SU]); | [Y]US5133832 (GILKEY MARK W [US]); | [Y]EP0541457 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [Y]US2003205344 (LASMARIAS VICENTE [US], et al); | [Y]US2006048908 (WANG XIANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2008035292 (SINGH KAPIL M [US], et al); | [Y] - BLANCO ET AL., "Full characterization of stickies in a newsprint mill: the need for a complementary approach.", TAPPI JOURNAL, (200701), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 19 - 25, XP055125001 |