EP2580210 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seragon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 12780 El Camino Real, Suite No. 301 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Aragon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 12780 El Camino Real Suite 301 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHRAMAN, Mehmet 8617 Via Mallorca Unit E La Jolla CA 92037 / US | 02 /
GOVEK, Steven, P. 13216 Via Santillana San Diego CA 92129 / US | 03 /
NAGASAWA, Johnny, Y. 8525 Park Run Road San Diego CA 92129 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Nicholas, D. 1204 Beryl Street San Diego CA 92109 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11793115.4 | 08.06.2011 | [2017/09] | WO2011US39669 | Priority number, date | US20100353531P | 10.06.2010 Original published format: US 353531 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156518 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2580210 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580210 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D405/10, C07D311/04, A61K31/453, A61K31/352, A61P35/00, A61P25/28 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/353 (KR);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/453 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/32 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D311/60 (EP,US);
C07D407/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | 20.11.2012 | ME | 20.11.2012 | Title | German: | ÖSTROGENREZEPTORMODULATOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2013/16] | English: | ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND USES THEREOF | [2013/16] | French: | MODULATEUR DU RÉCEPTEUR OESTROGÉNIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17157571.5 / EP3205648 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | MK | 01.03.2017 | |
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | SM | 01.03.2017 | |
IS | 01.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0470310 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [I] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [I]WO9626201 (ENDORECHERCHE [CA]) [I] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [I]WO2004091488 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [I] - SHARMA A P ET AL, "Structure-Activity-Relationship of Antiestrogens. Effect of the Side Chain and Its Position on the Activity of 2,3-Diaryl-2H-1-benzopyrans", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19900101), vol. 33, doi:10.1021/JM00174A019, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3216 - 3222, XP002170868 [I] 1-17 * compounds 3-10 in chart II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00174a019 | International search | [X]US6262270 (DRAPER RICHARD W [US], et al); | [X]US2004259915 (KANOJIA RAMESH M [US], et al); | [X] - JAIN, N. ET AL., "Novel Chromene-Derived Selective Estrogen Receptor Modulators Useful for Alleviating Hot Flushed and Vaginal Dryness.", J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 3056 - 3059, XP055084151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm060353u | [X] - LI, XUN. ET AL., "Synthesis of Tetracyclic Heterocompounds as Selective Estrogen Receptor Modulators. Part 3. Development of an Acid-Catalized Racemization processor (S)-2,8-(Dimathoxy)-5-{4-[2-(1-piperidinyl)ethoxy]- phenyl}-11,12-dihydro-5H-6,13-dioxabenzo[3,4]cyclohepta[1,2-a]naphthalene.", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, (2009), vol. 13, pages 102 - 105, XP055084155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/op800237y | [X] - JAIN, N. ET AL., "Identification and Structure-Activity Relationships of Chromene-Derived Selective Estrogen Receptor Modulators for Treatment of Postmenopausal Symptoms.", J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, pages 7044 - 7569, XP055102365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm900146e | [X] - LI, XUN. ET AL., "Synthesis of Tetracyclic Heterocompounds as Selective Estrogen Receptor Modulators. Part 2. Process improvement for Scale-Up of 2,5 ,8-Substituted-11,12-dihydro-5H-6,13-dioxabenzo[3,4]cyclohepta[1,2-alnaphtha len.", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, (2007), vol. 11, pages 731 - 738, XP055084146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/op700061x | Examination | - PURSER SOPHIE ET AL, "Fluorine in medicinal chemistry", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1039/B610213C, ISSN 0306-0012, (20080201), pages 320 - 330, (20071213), XP002596910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b610213c | by applicant | US4229447 | US4596795 | US4755386 | US5011692 | US5017381 | US5229135 | US5739136 | US5837284 | US5840329 | - GRONEMEYER; LAUDET, PROTEIN PROFILE, (1995), vol. 2, pages 1173 - 1308 | - GREENFIELD ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 40, pages 6646 - 6652 | - WELBOREN ET AL., ENDOCRINE-RELATED CANCER, (2009), vol. 16, pages 1073 - 1089 | - KLINGE, STEROID, (2000), vol. 65, pages 227 - 251 | - BRZOZOWSKI ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 753 - 758 | - WARD; WEIGEL, BIOFACTORS, (2009), vol. 35, pages 528 - 536 | - TAMRAZI ET AL., MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (2003), vol. 17, pages 2593 - 2602 | - REID ET AL., MOL CELL, (2003), vol. 11, pages 695 - 707 | - CAREY; SUNDBERG, ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, PLENUM, (2000), vol. A, B | - Method in Enzymology, ACADEMIC, (1985), vol. 42, pages 309 - 396 | - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", BUNDGAARD, H., A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, (1991), pages 113 - 191 | - BUNDGAARD, H., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEW, (1992), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - SINGH ET AL., Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (2002), pages 754 - 757 |