EP2655426 - CATALYST COMPOSITION WITH ALKOXYALKYL ESTER INTERNAL ELECTRON DONOR AND POLYMER FROM SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. Grace & CO. - CONN. 7500 Grace Drive Colombia, MD 21044 / US | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Linfeng 4015 Tuscan Shores Drive Missouri City TX 77459 / US | 02 /
GONZALEZ, Kelly 23623 Litchfield Bend Lane Katy TX 77494 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/44] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11793979.3 | 01.12.2011 | WO2011US62819 | Priority number, date | US20100974322 | 21.12.2010 Original published format: US 974322 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012087531 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655426 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/651, C08F10/00 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/651 (KR);
C08F10/06 (KR);
C08F110/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/651 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT INTERNEM ALKOXYPROPYLESTER-ELEKTRONENDONATOR UND POLYMER DARAUS | [2013/44] | English: | CATALYST COMPOSITION WITH ALKOXYALKYL ESTER INTERNAL ELECTRON DONOR AND POLYMER FROM SAME | [2013/44] | French: | COMPOSITION CATALYTIQUE COMPORTANT UN DONNEUR D'ÉLECTRONS INTERNE À BASE D'ESTER D'ALCOXYALKYLE ET UN POLYMÈRE PRODUIT À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4563436 (YOKOYAMA MASUZO [JP], et al) [X] 10-12 * claims 1-7 * * examples 1-12 * * column 5, line 10 - line 14 * [Y] 1-9; | JPS61287905 [ ] (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [Y]WO2010078479 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0150] * | [XY] - YOKOYAMA, MASUZO ET AL, ".alpha.-Olefin polymerization catalysts", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1987:440554, URL: STN, XP002669737 [X] 10-12 * abstract * [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | US5539309 | US6825146 | US20100974548 |