EP2783277 - QUEUING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHACHAR, Yaron Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
ZECHARIA, Rami Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 Munich / DE | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11794131.0 | 07.12.2011 | WO2011EP72086 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013083191 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783277 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/06, H04L12/70 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
G06F5/065 (EP);
H04L47/564 (EP);
H04L49/901 (EP);
G06F5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | WARTESCHLANGENVORRICHTUNG | [2014/40] | English: | QUEUING APPARATUS | [2014/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE MISE EN FILES D'ATTENTE | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/06] | 28.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2017 | 27.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO0184773 (MOSAID TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,8,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 19 * * page 3, line 1 - line 10 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 24 * * page 7, line 1 - line 3 * * page 8, line 27 - line 30 * * page 11, line 5 - line 8 * * page 13, line 5 - page 14, line 8 * * claims 1,5 * * figures 1,4,8 * [Y] 7,9,10,12,13 [I] 6,11,14; | [A]US2002110139 (BOURA JIHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] ** figure 2 *; | [A]US2007147404 (VAN HAALEN RONALD [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP1811370 (ST MICROELECTRONICS PVT LTD [IN]) [Y] 7,9,10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,15; | [A]US2009034549 (SONI MANEESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 4 * |