EP2652309 - HIGH PRESSURE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/43] | HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP | ||
[2014/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCARELLI, Francesco Spitaeckerstrasse 22 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
SCHOLZ, Frank Sandaeckerstr. 17 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | [2013/43] | Application number, filing date | 11794767.1 | 14.12.2011 | WO2011EP72751 | Priority number, date | DE20101063351 | 17.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010063351 | [2013/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012080330 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2652309 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2652309 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/10 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
F02M59/102 (EP);
F04B1/0408 (EP);
F04B1/0417 (EP);
F04B1/0426 (EP);
F02M63/0001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKPUMPE | [2014/45] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE PUMP | [2014/45] | French: | POMPE HAUTE PRESSION | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/43] | HOCHDRUCKPUMPE | ||
Former [2013/43] | HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP | ||
Former [2013/43] | POMPE HAUTE PRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2011 | AL | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MK | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | RS | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | FR | 05.01.2015 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MK | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102006031032 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4708102 (SCHMID KARL J [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 47 - line 57; figure - *; | [X]EP1544462 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4,6 *; | [A]US2007277763 (BRINKS BARRY T [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE10115168 (ORANGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE102005046670 |