EP2582590 - A CONTAINER COMPRISING A CLOSURE AND A BODY AND A METHOD FOR STORING A SAMPLE IN THE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/17] | A CONTAINER, A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER, AND A BASE FOR A CONTAINER | ||
[2021/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pathogen Detection Systems, Inc. 382 King Street East Kingston, Ontario K7K 2Y2 / CA | For all designated states Queen's University At Kingston Kingston, Ontario K7L 3N6 / CA | [2021/32] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Pathogen Detection Systems, Inc. Suite 4697 Biosciences Complex 116 Barrie Street Kingston, Ontario K7L 3N6 / CA | ||
For all designated states Queen's University At Kingston Kingston, Ontario K7L 3N6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, R. Stephen 136 Beverly Street Kingston Ontario K7L 3Y6 / CA | 02 /
MARCOTTE, Eric 1052 Earnhart St. Kingston Ontario K7P 3B9 / CA | 03 /
WILTON, Doug 82 Earl Street Kingston Ontario K7L 2G7 / CA | 04 /
GALLANT, Peter 1635 Abbey Dawn Road Kingston Ontario K7L 5H6 / CA | 05 /
ROBINSON, David 1 Clanking Little Kimble Buckinghamshire HP22 5XS / GB | 06 /
STOKES, Les 9 Thorverton Road London England NW2 1RE / GB | 07 /
HOLDCROFT, Peter 37 Tortoiseshell Way Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 1TB / GB | 08 /
MILES, Matthew 25 Hillside Gardens Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2LF / GB | 09 /
WILKINSON, Simon 15 Locknell Road Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 3QD / GB | 10 /
UNDERWOOD, Lee 27 Sanctuary Road High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP15 7JS / GB | [2021/32] |
Former [2013/17] | 01 /
BROWN, R. Stephen 136 Beverly Street Kingston Ontario K7L 3Y6 / CA | ||
02 /
MARCOTTE, Eric 198 Lakeview Avenue Kingston Ontario K7M 3V1 / CA | |||
03 /
WILTON, Doug 82 Earl Street Kingston Ontario K7L 2G7 / CA | |||
04 /
GALLANT, Peter 1635 Abbey Dawn Road Kingston Ontario K7L 5H6 / CA | |||
05 /
ROBINSON, David 1 Clanking Little Kimble Buckinghamshire HP22 5XS / GB | |||
06 /
STOKES, Les 9 Thorverton Road London England NW2 1RE / GB | |||
07 /
HOLDCROFT, Peter 37 Tortoiseshell Way Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 1TB / GB | |||
08 /
MILES, Matthew 25 Hillside Gardens Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2LF / GB | |||
09 /
WILKINSON, Simon 15 Locknell Road Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 3QD / GB | |||
10 /
UNDERWOOD, Lee 27 Sanctuary Road High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP15 7JS / GB | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2021/32] |
Former [2013/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11794997.4 | 17.06.2011 | [2021/32] | WO2011CA00716 | Priority number, date | US20100356364P | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 356364 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156912 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2582590 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582590 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B65D55/02 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
B65D43/16 (KR);
B65D55/02 (US);
A61J1/00 (KR);
A61J1/05 (KR);
B65B5/08 (US);
B65B7/28 (US);
B65D3/14 (US);
B65D43/22 (US);
B65D55/024 (EP,US);
G01N1/04 (KR);
B01L2200/141 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | C12M1/34, C12Q1/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/52, G01N33/58 | ||
Former IPC [2013/17] | B65D55/00, B01L3/14, B65D43/16, B65D43/22, B65D50/00, B65D55/02, C12M1/24, C12M1/42, C12Q1/00, G01N1/00, G01N21/03, G01N33/50, G01N37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN BEHÄLTER MIT EINEM VERSCHLUSS UND EINEM KÖRPER UND EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG EINER PROBE IM BEHÄLTER | [2021/09] | English: | A CONTAINER COMPRISING A CLOSURE AND A BODY AND A METHOD FOR STORING A SAMPLE IN THE CONTAINER | [2021/09] | French: | CONTENEUR COMPRENANT UNE FERMETURE ET UN CORPS ET UN PROCEDE DE STOCKAGE D'UN ECHANTILLON DANS LE CONTENEUR | [2021/09] |
Former [2013/17] | BEHÄLTER, VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER UND SOCKEL FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | ||
Former [2013/17] | A CONTAINER, A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER, AND A BASE FOR A CONTAINER | ||
Former [2013/17] | RÉCEPTACLE, FERMETURE POUR RÉCEPTACLE ET BASE POUR RÉCEPTACLE | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 15.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | DK | 11.08.2021 | |
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | DK | 11.08.2021 | |
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 11.08.2021 | |
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | FI | 11.08.2021 | |
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 11.08.2021 | |
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 11.08.2021 | |
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4974735 (NEWELL ROBERT E [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5012941 (ABRAMS ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2009095699 (MILANTE GAETAN [CA]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0066]; figures 1-11 *; | [I]EP2191896 (KALTEK S R L [IT]) [I] 1-16* paragraphs [0012] - [0054]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US5012941 (ABRAMS ROBERT S [US], et al); | [Y]US5685444 (VALLEY JOSEPH P [US]); | [Y]US6398067 (BELFANCE JOHN [US], et al); | [X]CA2610284 (BARTEC GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US4974735 | US5012941 | US2009095699 | EP2191896 |