EP2583969 - NOVEL RHODANINE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF AIDS CONTAINING THE RHODANINE DERIVATIVES AS ACTIVE INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avixgen Inc. 505, Banpo-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-040 / KR | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOU, Ji Chang 1-101 Seocho Nokwon Apt. Seocho-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 130-070 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Gyoon Hee 209-1702 Sinyeongtong Hyundai 1 Cha Apt. Banwol-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-982 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Chul Ho 853-1 Hwagok 2-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-904 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Doo Na 101-1108 Kukdong Miraju Apt Hawangsimni 2-dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-020 / KR | 05 /
CHUNG, Koo Hwan 412-404 Rexle Apt. Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11795995.7 | 17.06.2011 | WO2011KR04445 | Priority number, date | KR20100057967 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: KR 20100057967 | [2013/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011159129 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2583969 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/427, A61P31/18, A61K31/5377, C07D413/06, C07D417/06 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | C07D417/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/427, A61P31/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | NEUE RHODANINDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON AIDS MIT DEN RHODANINDERIVATEN ALS WIRKSTOFFE | [2013/17] | English: | NOVEL RHODANINE DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF AIDS CONTAINING THE RHODANINE DERIVATIVES AS ACTIVE INGREDIENTS | [2013/17] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE RHODANINE, PROCÉDÉ POUR LES PRÉPARER ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DU SIDA CONTENANT LES DÉRIVÉS DE RHODANINE COMME PRINCIPES ACTIFS | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2013 | Translation filed | 11.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 23.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2011063602 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH [CN], et al) [XP] 1,3,4 * compound 42 in page 31 *; | [XP]WO2011050211 (AGIOS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,4 * last compound in page 127 *; | [X]US2008033025 (PELLECCHIA MAURIZIO [US], et al) [X] 3,4 * compounds 2, 6, 9, 11 and 11A9 in pages 5, 6 and 14 *; | [X]WO2005016227 (INSIGHT BIOPHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 3-5 * compounds 12 and 73 in pages 88 and 91 *; | [X]WO2004028535 (PINTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 3,4 * third compounds, first row, page 28; first compound, 5th row, page 31; first compound, 3rd row, page 37; first compound, 12th row, page 39; 3rd compound, first row, page 30; third compound, 3rd row, page 38; 2nd compound, first row, page 40 *; | [X]WO0032598 (STRUCTURAL BIOINFORMATICS INC [US]) [X] 3-5 * lines 19-20 in page 96; page 1, lines 31-32 *; | [I]US2009088420 (NEAMATI NOURI [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * compound RT3 in page 23 and compounds AV15A2 and T36 in page 63 *; | [I]WO2009059243 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 3, lines 22-24 and claims *; | [I]WO2005041951 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * Formula IVb in embodiment 4b (column 5), column 3, lines 11-15 * | International search | [Y]WO2009059243 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [Y]US7566732 (SINGH RAJINDER [US], et al) | by applicant | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY |