EP2655879 - WIND POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERRER, Siegfried Gablonzerstraße 22 91315 Höchstadt / DE | 02 /
PICKEL, Edgar Frankenstraße 3a 97334 Sommerach / DE | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Schonecke, Mitja SKF GmbH IA&IP Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Schonecke, Mitja SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11797243.0 | 15.12.2011 | [2015/50] | WO2011EP72838 | Priority number, date | DE20101063687 | 21.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010063687 | [2013/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012084665 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2655879 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655879 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, F16C19/38, F16C33/60, F16C17/00, F16C32/06, F16C33/58, F16H1/22 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
F03D80/70 (EP);
F16H1/227 (EP);
F05B2260/79 (EP);
F16C17/00 (EP);
F16C19/385 (EP);
F16C2360/31 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | F03D11/00, F16C19/38, F16C33/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [2013/44] | English: | WIND POWER PLANT | [2013/44] | French: | ÉOLIENNE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 03.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | IT | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | FR | 09.02.2016 | GB | 09.03.2016 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 09.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102007041508 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032]; figure - * [I] 8; | [XI]DE102007042770 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure - * [I] 8; | [XI]EP1677005 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0066] , [0067]; figures 3,11 * [I] 8; | [XDI]DE10351524 (WEITKAMP ROLAND [DE]) [XD] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0033]; figure 3 * [I] 8; | [AD]DE102007008758 (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102007041508 | DE102007008758 | DE102006057055 | DE10351524 | DE102007042770 | EP1677005 |