EP2786175 - MOTION-STABILISED LIDAR AND METHOD FOR WIND SPEED MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXYS Technologies Esplanadestraat 1 8400 Oostende / BE | [2016/29] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states Flidar Esplanadestraat 1 8400 Oostende / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFFEY, Thomas Rue Vondel 42 B-1030 Schaerbeek / BE | 02 /
KYRIAZIS, Anthanazios, Stefanos Rue Defacqz 73 B-1060 Saint-Gilles / BE | 03 /
DEVRIENDT, Dirk Muizenhoekstraat 51 B-2812 Muizen / BE | 04 /
COPPYE, Werner Rue du Grand Moulin 11 B-1370 Jodoigne / BE | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Gyi, Jeffrey Ivan, et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 11797304.0 | 29.11.2011 | [2016/30] | WO2011EP71311 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013079099 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786175 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2786175 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/95, G01S17/58, G01S7/48, G01S7/497 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G01S17/58 (EP,CN,US);
G01P5/00 (US);
G01S17/95 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/4808 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/497 (EP,CN,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSSTABILISIERTER LIDAR UND VERFAHREN ZUR WINDGESCHWINDIGKEITSMESSUNG | [2014/41] | English: | MOTION-STABILISED LIDAR AND METHOD FOR WIND SPEED MEASUREMENT | [2014/41] | French: | LIDAR À MOUVEMENT STABILISÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE VITESSE DU VENT | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | MT | 29.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
MT | 29.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
MT | 29.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5796471 (WILKERSON THOMAS D [US], et al) [A] 1,5,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - line 45 ** column 5, lines 26,44 *; | [Y]WO2009025911 (SECOND WIND INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 16 - line 19 * * page 5, line 24 - line 26 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 5 * * page 12, line 17 - line 20 *; | [Y] - CARTER D ET AL, "First Test of a Shipboard Wind Profiler", BULLETIN OF THE METEOROLOGICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN METEOROLOGICAL SOCIETY, BOSTON, MA, US, (19921001), vol. 73, no. 10, ISSN 0003-0007, pages 1587 - 1592, XP007920951 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1175/1520-0477(1992)073<1587:FTOASW>2.0.CO;2 | by applicant | WO2005008284 | - KARLSSON ET AL., APPLIED OPTICS, (20000720), vol. 39, no. 21 |