EP2583127 - FIBER OPTIC CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finisar Corporation 1389 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 9560-1133 / CA | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFNUER, Stefan, Martin 9 Eagle Hill Terrace Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thamrs Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11798775.0 | 21.06.2011 | WO2011US41297 | Priority number, date | US20100356748P | 21.06.2010 Original published format: US 356748 P | US201113165653 | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US201113165653 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011163266 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2583127 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
G02B6/3825 (EP,US);
G02B6/3877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | GLASFASERKONNEKTOREN | [2013/17] | English: | FIBER OPTIC CONNECTORS | [2013/17] | French: | CONNECTEURS DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2014 | 30.06.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006251359 (MORGENSTERN DAVID [US]) [X] 1,12,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0029] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-11,13,15; | [XI]US6164835 (IMASAKI KATSUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,14 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 35 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2-13,15; | [A]US4795231 (TANABE TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 50 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5946436 (TAKASHI SYUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1A, 1B *; | [A]EP0443409 (SHIMEO SEIMITSU KK [JP]) [A] 10 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2007079422 (ADAMANT KOGYO CO); | [Y]US2004247255 (ROSENBURG PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US5887095 (NAGASE RYO [JP], et al) |