EP2651324 - SHAPING TOOL FOR SHAPING AN ACETABULUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Medical GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 8/13 61273 Wehrheim / DE | [2015/02] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Heraeus Medical GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 8/13 61273 Wehrheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUEST, Edgar Santo-Tirso-Ring 34 64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Berner Straße 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Berner Strasse 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2013/52] | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte Berner Strasse 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | Panten, Kirsten, et al Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 11799233.9 | 23.11.2011 | WO2011EP05893 | Priority number, date | DE20101054663 | 15.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010054663 | US201161491599P | 31.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161491599 P | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012079695 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651324 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651324 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/88, A61F2/46 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/8802 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMWERKZEUG ZUM FORMEN EINER HÜFTGELENKPFANNE | [2013/43] | English: | SHAPING TOOL FOR SHAPING AN ACETABULUM | [2013/43] | French: | OUTIL DE FAÇONNAGE POUR FAÇONNER UN ACÉTABULUM | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 06.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2011 | AL | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | RS | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HR | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2297911 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0916324 (BENOIST GIRARD & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006024840 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2297911 |