EP2640587 - VEHICLE INTERIOR TRIM PART HAVING AN INCREASED CRASH RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Interiors GmbH & Co. KG Mülhausener Strasse 35 47929 Grefrath / DE | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Detlef Am Stockberger Busch 8 51515 Kürten / DE | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/39] | Wolff, Felix Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11799360.0 | 15.11.2011 | WO2011EP05746 | Priority number, date | DE20101051160 | 15.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010051160 | [2013/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012065717 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640587 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B60R13/02 (EP);
B29C63/02 (EP);
B29K2105/0809 (EP);
B29L2031/3005 (EP);
B60R21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGINNENAUSSTATTUNGSTEIL MIT EINER ERHÖHTEN CRASHFESTIGKEIT | [2013/39] | English: | VEHICLE INTERIOR TRIM PART HAVING AN INCREASED CRASH RESISTANCE | [2013/39] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ÉQUIPEMENT INTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE AUX CHOCS ACCRUE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102007026747 (KOENIG & HOHMANN UND OTTO LUEB [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] *; | [X]DE20317241U (QUADRANT PLASTIC COMPOSITES AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]WO2008150036 (LEE KEUN SANG [KR]) [A] 1,3,5-7 * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO03037668 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,5-7 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 1; figures 2,,3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102004032029 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP1617098 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,7 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * | Examination | DE10029516 | by applicant | DE10064680 | DE19747710 | DE102005026889 | DE19501292 | DE10120099 |