EP2646373 - ELECTROLYSIS CELL FOR GENERATING OZONE FOR TREATING A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brita GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 4 65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRADT, Berthold Hünefeldstraße 10 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
WEIDNER, Peter Kapellenweg 18 92444 Rötz / DE | 03 /
KEMMER, Ron Wassersteinchen 1 97877 Wertheim / DE | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | van Lookeren Campagne, Constantijn August Brita GmbH Intellectual Property Rights Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 4 65232 Taunusstein / DE | Application number, filing date | 11799386.5 | 02.12.2011 | WO2011EP71586 | Priority number, date | DE20101062433 | 03.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010062433 | [2013/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012072784 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646373 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461, C02F1/467 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F1/46114 (EP,US);
C02F1/4672 (EP,US);
C25B1/13 (US);
C02F2001/46138 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4613 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46135 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46195 (EP,US);
C02F2209/04 (EP,US);
C02F2209/05 (EP,US);
C02F2209/23 (EP,US);
C02F2301/043 (EP,US);
C02F2307/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYSEZELLE ZUM ERZEUGEN VON OZON ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2013/41] | English: | ELECTROLYSIS CELL FOR GENERATING OZONE FOR TREATING A LIQUID | [2013/41] | French: | CELLULE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE POUR PRODUIRE DE L'OZONE DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT D'UN LIQUIDE | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03048421 (MICROMED LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 20 *[I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1741676 (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0049] - [0066] - [0084] - [0110]; figure - * [I] 2-4,6-15 | by applicant | US6254762 | DE10025167 | DE10316759 | DE102004015680 |