EP2612366 - FINE LINE METALLIZATION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES BY PARTIAL LIFT-OFF OF OPTICAL COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetrasun, Inc. 20640 Third Street Suite 250A Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ-WITTMANN, Olivier 970 Corte Madera Avenue, Apt. 401 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 02 /
CRAFTS, Douglas 18760 Blythswood Drive Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 03 /
DECEUSTER, Denis 12 SkyLonda Drive Woodside, California 94062 / US | 04 /
TURNER, Adrian 4206E Rickeys Way Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/28] | Friese, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11799603.3 | 15.02.2011 | WO2011US24857 | Priority number, date | US20100379810P | 03.09.2010 Original published format: US 379810 P | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030407 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612366 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0248, H01L31/18, H01L31/0216, H01L31/0224 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L31/18 (CN);
H01L31/02168 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/022433 (CN);
H01L31/022441 (KR);
H01L31/02366 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | H01L31/0248, H01L31/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | FEINMETALLISIERUNG VON PHOTOVOLTAIKVORRICHTUNGEN DURCH PARTIELLE ANHEBUNG OPTISCHER BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2013/28] | English: | FINE LINE METALLIZATION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICES BY PARTIAL LIFT-OFF OF OPTICAL COATINGS | [2013/28] | French: | MÉTALLISATION EN LIGNES FINES DE DISPOSITIFS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES PAR ENLÈVEMENT PARTIEL DE REVÊTEMENTS OPTIQUES | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5181968 (NATH PREM [US], et al) [X] 13 * abstract * * column 8, lines 5-21, 35-53 * * column 9, lines 1-7, 55 - column 10 * [A] 1-5,7-12; | [XA]US2009293268 (CARMI YOASH [IL]) [X] 13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0 21] - [0025] - [0 27] , [0 34] * [A] 1-5,7-12 | International search | [A]JPS56164583 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2000058885 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US7375378 (MANIVANNAN VENKATESAN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010US31869 |