EP2588113 - A RECONSTITUTED HIGH DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN FORMULATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Limited 45 Poplar Road Parkville VIC 3052 / AU | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Samuel 516 Hillside Avenue Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 02 /
IMBODEN, Martin Schlossmatte 4 CH-3110 Munsingen / CH | 03 /
BOLLI, Reinhard Bellevuestrasse 14 CH-3073 Guemlingen / CH | 04 /
WAELCHLI, Marcel Wohlhausenweg 2D CH-3645 Gwatt / CH | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Hauser, Hans-Peter, et al CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Straße 76 D-35041 Marburg / DE | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11799979.7 | 30.06.2011 | [2016/50] | WO2011AU00819 | Priority number, date | US20100359925P | 30.06.2010 Original published format: US 359925 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000048 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588113 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588113 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K31/685, A61K31/56, A61P9/10, A61P3/06 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1275 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/685, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | A61K31/56, A61K31/685, A61P3/06, A61P9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKONSTITUIERTE HOCHDICHTE LIPOPROTEINFORMULIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/19] | English: | A RECONSTITUTED HIGH DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN FORMULATION AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2013/19] | French: | FORMULATION DE LIPOPROTÉINES DE DENSITÉ ÉLEVÉE RECONSTITUÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16203579.4 / EP3178481 | EP18215066.4 / EP3492085 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | MT | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - LERCH P G ET AL, "PRODUCTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A RECONSTITUTED HIGH DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN FOR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (19960901), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1046/J.1423-0410.1996.7130155.X, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 155 - 164, XP008009380 [X] 1,2,5-12,15-19,21,22 * page 157; table 1 * [Y] 3,4,13,14,20,23,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1423-0410.1996.7130155.x | [Y] - TARDIF J C ET AL, "Effects of reconstituted high-density lipoprotein infusions on coronary atherosclerosis - A randomized controlled trial", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, vol. 297, no. 15, doi:10.1001/JAMA.297.15.JPC70004, ISSN 0098-7484, (20070418), pages 1675 - 1682, (20070326), XP002720081 [Y] 1-24 * page 1676 * * page 1680 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.297.15.jpc70004 | [Y] - MATZ C E ET AL, "MICELLAR COMPLEXES OF HUMAN APO LIPO PROTEIN A-I WITH PHOSPHATIDYL CHOLINES AND CHOLESTEROL PREPARED FROM CHOLATE LIPID DISPERSIONS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (19820425), vol. 257, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4535 - 4540, XP002680274 [Y] 1-24 * page 4539; table II * | International search | [A]US5652339 (LERCH PETER [CH], et al); | [A]WO2010057203 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) |