EP2589665 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING THERAPEUTIC EFFECT OF IMMUNOTHERAPY ON CANCER PATIENT, AND GENE SET AND KIT TO BE USED IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurume University 67, Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 8300011 / JP | For all designated states Kyushu University, National University Corporation 10-1, Hakozaki 6-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | For all designated states Kurume Research Park Co., Ltd. 1-1 Hyakunenkoen Kurume-shi Fukuoka 839-0864 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Kurume University 67, Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 8300011 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyushu University National University Corporation 6-10-1, Hakozaki Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kurume Research Park Co., Ltd. 1-1 Hyakunenkoen Kurume-shi Fukuoka 839-0864 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Kyogo c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 02 /
NOGUCHI, Masanori c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 03 /
KUHARA, Satoru c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 10-1 Hakozaki 6-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-0053 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Akira c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 05 /
SHICHIJO, Shigeki c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 06 /
KOMATSU, Nobukazu c/o Kurume University 67 Asahi-machi Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0011 / JP | 07 /
TASHIRO, Kosuke c/o Kyushu University National University Corporation 10-1 Hakozaki 6-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-0053 / JP | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11800481.1 | 30.03.2011 | WO2011JP58094 | Priority number, date | JP20100147797 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010147797 | [2013/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012002011 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589665 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09, G01N33/53 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES THERAPEUTISCHEN EFFEKTS EINER IMMUNTHERAPIE AUF EINEN KREBSPATIENTEN SOWIE IN DEM VERFAHREN VERWENDETER GENSATZ UND -KIT | [2013/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTING THERAPEUTIC EFFECT OF IMMUNOTHERAPY ON CANCER PATIENT, AND GENE SET AND KIT TO BE USED IN THE METHOD | [2013/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE L'EFFET THÉRAPEUTIQUE D'UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE SUR UN PATIENT CANCÉREUX, ET ENSEMBLE DE GÈNES ET KIT À UTILISER DANS LE PROCÉDÉ | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2013 | Translation filed | 29.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 13.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008076134 (MURACA PATRICK J [US]) [X] 8-12,14,15 * page 7, column 1, paragraph 4 *; | [I]WO2008086182 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [I] 1,5-7,13* page 51 - page 53 *; | [I]WO2010029174 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [I] 1,5-7,13 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - line 17 * * page 14, line 13 - page 17, line 27 *; | [I] - REDDISH M A ET AL, "PRE-IMMUNOTHERAPY SERUM CA27.29 (MUC-1) MUCIN LEVEL AND CD69+ LYMPHOCYTES CORRELATE WITH EFFECTS OF THERATOPE SIALYL-TN-KLH CANCER VACCINE IN ACTIVE SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19960101), vol. 42, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S002620050287, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 303 - 309, XP000914873 [I] 1,5-7,13 * abstract * * page 304; figure 2 * * page 306, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002620050287 | [I] - CELESTIA S. HIGANO ET AL, "Integrated data from 2 randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled, phase 3 trials of active cellular immunotherapy with sipuleucel-T in advanced prostate cancer", CANCER, (20090815), vol. 115, no. 16, doi:10.1002/cncr.24429, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 3670 - 3679, XP055083505 [I] 1,5-7,13 * abstract * * page 3673 - page 3676; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.24429 | [A] - WHELAN M ET AL, "Biomarkers for development of cancer vaccines", PERSONALIZED MEDICINE 200602 GB, (200602), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1741-0541, pages 79 - 88, XP009173349 [A] 1,5-7,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/17410541.3.1.79 | [I] - WANG XI-DE ET AL, "Identification of candidate predictive and surrogate molecular markers for dasatinib in prostate cancer: rationale for patient selection and efficacy monitoring", GENOME BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20071129), vol. 8, ISSN 1465-6906, page R255, XP021041521 [I] 1,5-7,13 * the whole document * | [A] - MOCELLIN S ET AL, "Dissecting tumor responsiveness to immunotherapy: the experience of peptide-based melanoma vaccines", BBA - REVIEWS ON CANCER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20031205), vol. 1653, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0304-419X(03)00032-5, ISSN 0304-419X, pages 61 - 71, XP004475892 [A] 1,5-7,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-419X(03)00032-5 | [AP] - BARACH Y S ET AL, "T cell coinhibition in prostate cancer: new immune evasion pathways and emerging therapeutics", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER CURRENT TRENDS, GB, vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MOLMED.2010.09.006, ISSN 1471-4914, (20110101), pages 47 - 55, (20110101), XP027594044 [AP] 1,5-7,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2010.09.006 | International search | [Y]JP2007037409 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2009509525 (DIGITAL GENOMICS INC.); | [Y]JP2009532035 (BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.); | [XE]WO2011040532 (UNIV KURUME [JP], et al); | [X] - SHI W. ET AL., "Illumina WG-6 BeadChip strips should be normalized separately", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2009), vol. 10, no. 372, XP021061900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-10-372 | [Y] - MASANORI NOGUCHI, "7. Tailor-Made-gata Peptide Vaccine Ryoho ni yoru Sainen Zenritsusen Gan no Chiryo Seiseki", HINYOKIGEKA, (2008), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 1043 - 1047 | by applicant | JP2008536094 | JP2010147797 | - YUJIN HOSHIDA, Microarrays for an Integrative Genomics, SPRINGER-VERLAG TOKYO, INC. | - SUNGWOO KWON ET AL., "DNA Microarray Data Analysis for Cancer Classification Based on Stepwise Discriminant Analysis and Bayesian Decision Theory", GENOME INFORMATICS, (2001), vol. 12, pages 252 - 254 |