EP2589359 - PANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ITEM OF CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinesei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHINO, Yuki c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
MASAKI, Shunsuke c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/19] | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11800772.3 | 27.06.2011 | [2016/29] | WO2011JP64644 | Priority number, date | JP20100151493 | 01.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010151493 | [2013/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012002308 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589359 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2589359 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/496, A61F13/476, A61F13/49, A61F13/515, A61F13/494 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
A61F13/49011 (EP,US);
A61F13/476 (US);
A61F13/49466 (EP,US);
A61F13/496 (EP,US);
A61F13/515 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | A61F13/496 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGE HOSE | [2013/19] | English: | PANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ITEM OF CLOTHING | [2013/19] | French: | VÊTEMENT ABSORBANT DE TYPE CULOTTE | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2012 | Translation filed | 07.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2011 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007144838 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 21 *; | [I]JP4388136B (DAIO PAPER CORP) [I] 1-8* paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0025] , [0057] * | International search | [Y]JP2008194161 (LIVEDO CORP); | [A]JP2009160128 (DAIO SEISHI KK); | [Y]JP2009240640 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [A]JP2009240695 (UNI CHARM CORP) | by applicant | JP2007014538 |