EP2588106 - SUSTAINED-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING PRAMIPEXOLE OR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF WITH IMPROVED STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Pharm Co., Ltd. 200 Namgwan-ri Poongse-myeon Cheonan-shi Choongcheongnam-do 330-911 / KR | For all designated states Bio Pharmartis Co., Ltd. 811 New T Castle 429-1 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu, Seoul 153-779 / KR | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Joon 1109-1003 Pangyowon Maeul 513 Pangyo-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-410 / KR | 02 /
CHANG, Kwan-Young 129-604 Hwagok Daewoo Purgio Apt. Hwagok 3-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-773 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Jae-Soon 204-403 Hakmaeul Apt. Sinjeong 3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-794 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Jae-Min 113-1002 Taeyoung Apt. Daeheung-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-764 / KR | 05 /
KAM, Sung-Hoon 568-22 Yeonnam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-240 / KR | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/19] | Verboom, Renzo Christiaan, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11801051.1 | 12.05.2011 | WO2011KR03515 | Priority number, date | KR20100064044 | 02.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100064044 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012002644 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2588106 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425, A61K9/22, A61K9/20, A61K47/38 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/425 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | VERZÖGERT FREIGESETZTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PRAMIPEXOL ODER EINEM PHARMAZEUTISCH ZULÄSSIGEN SALZ DAVON MIT ERHÖHTER STABILITÄT | [2013/19] | English: | SUSTAINED-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING PRAMIPEXOLE OR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF WITH IMPROVED STABILITY | [2013/19] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE CONTENANT DU PRAMIPEXOLE, OU L'UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES, PRÉSENTANT UNE MEILLEURE STABILITÉ | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009152041 (SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 50] * * claims 2, 10 * [I] 8; | [XI]WO2007054976 (PANACEA BIOTEC LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0029] * * claims 7-12 * * example 6 * [I] 9; | [XI]WO2007002518 (SPHERICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 144] , [ 151] , [ 227] , [ 230] , [ 244] , [ 327] , [ 346] - [0349] - [ 364 ] * * Examples * * Claims * [I] 8; | [X]EP0428038 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraph [0008] * * Examples *; | [XP]WO2011037976 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al) [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 12, line 29 - line 30 * * page 13, line 8 - line 17 * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 14 * * page 21, line 10 - line 14 * * Examples * | International search | [X]US2010086589 (FRIEDL THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]WO2008068778 (ALEMBIC LTD [IN], et al); | [A]US2006110454 (KSHIRSAGAR RAJESH [IN], et al); | [A]US2005226926 (AMIDON GREGORY E [US], et al) |